Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Reinhold Ertel (until 1976-06-30) | 1924-12-02 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Uwe Seiler (until 1989-06-30) | 1956-08-06 | ||||
Werner Kamper (until 1976-06-30) | 1943-08-14 | ||||
Abwehr | |||||
Lothar Gans (until 1984-06-30) | 1953-02-17 | ||||
Klaus Baumanns (until 1980-06-30) | 1948-09-15 | ||||
Heinz Koch (until 1978-06-30) | 1949-09-03 | ||||
Jurgen Wohlgemuth (until 1977-06-30) | 1947-10-13 | ||||
Lothar Lazar (until 1976-06-30) | 1947-05-20 | ||||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Detlev Hegekotter (until 1980-06-30) | 1951-01-06 | ||||
Reinhold Nordmann (until 1979-06-30) | 1948-06-07 | ||||
Hans-Jurgen Wittfoht (until 1978-06-30) | 1948-01-29 | ||||
Franz Genschick (until 1977-11-15) | 1949-06-05 | ||||
Hans-Jurgen Andexer (until 1976-06-30) | 1950-12-19 | ||||
Hannes Kaumkotter (until 1976-06-30) | 1949-02-14 | ||||
Peter Lunsdorf (until 1976-06-30) | 1949-05-29 | ||||
Sturm | |||||
Gerd-Volker Schock (until 1979-06-30) | 1950-04-08 | ||||
Herbert Muhlenberg (until 1978-06-30) | 1949-04-23 | ||||
Heinz-Dieter Greif (until 1978-06-30) | 1949-08-15 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Sunday, 1975-08-03 00:00 |
3 : 2 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 1975-10-19 00:00 |
3 : 2 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 1975-12-13 00:00 |
3 : 0 |
Schema Compare |