Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Otto Rehhagel (from 1976-02-29) (until 1976-06-30) | 1938-08-09 | ||||
Herbert Burdenski (until 1976-02-28) | 1922-05-19 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Dieter Burdenski (until 1988-06-30) | 1950-11-26 | ||||
Albert Voss (until 1981-06-30) | 1951-09-08 | ||||
Abwehr | |||||
Karl-Heinz Kamp (until 1985-06-30) | 1946-09-26 | ||||
Karlheinz Geils (until 1980-06-30) | 1955-05-20 | ||||
Per Rontved (until 1979-06-30) | 1949-01-27 | ||||
Horst-Dieter Hottges (until 1978-06-30) | 1943-09-10 | ||||
Mario Kontny (until 1977-06-30) | 1953-04-07 | ||||
Rudi Assauer (until 1976-06-30) | 1944-04-30 | ||||
Klaus Rutten (until 1976-06-30) | 1952-06-14 | ||||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Uwe Bracht (until 1984-06-30) | 1953-07-10 | ||||
Franz Hiller (until 1980-06-30) | 1950-10-22 | ||||
Jurgen Rober (until 1980-06-30) | 1953-12-25 | ||||
Ibrahim Sunday (until 1977-06-30) | 1944-07-22 | ||||
Peter Dietrich (until 1976-06-30) | 1944-03-06 | ||||
Dimitrios Daras (until 1976-06-30) | 1956-04-21 | ||||
Sturm | |||||
Werner Gorts (until 1978-06-30) | 1942-01-15 | ||||
Werner Weist (until 1977-06-30) | 1949-03-11 | ||||
Volker Ohling (until 1977-06-30) | 1955-01-17 | ||||
Georg Mullner (until 1976-08-31) | 1953-10-24 | ||||
Sanny Aslund (until 1976-06-30) | 1952-08-29 | ||||
Wolfgang Schlief (until 1976-06-30) | 1949-04-13 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Saturday, 1975-08-02 00:00 |
0 : 3 |
Schema Compare |