Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Manfred Krafft (from 1976-10-25) (until 1978-02-21) | 1937-12-11 | ||||
Bernd Stober (from 1976-10-19) (until 1976-10-24) | 1952-09-06 | ||||
Slobodan Cendic (until 1976-10-18) | 1938-08-28 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Dieter Ferner (until 1980-06-30) | 1949-01-16 | ||||
Norbert Sauer (until 1979-06-30) | 1949-12-16 | ||||
Abwehr | |||||
Ernst Traser (until 1985-06-30) | 1953-01-04 | ||||
Egon Schmitt (until 1982-06-30) | 1948-11-12 | ||||
Horst Bender (until 1979-06-30) | 1954-11-11 | ||||
Reinhold Zech (until 1979-06-30) | 1948-05-27 | ||||
Niko Semlitsch (until 1978-06-30) | 1946-11-27 | ||||
Bernd Forster (until 1978-06-30) | 1956-05-03 | ||||
Manfred Cremer (until 1977-06-30) | 1946-10-28 | ||||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Ludwig Denz (until 1981-06-30) | 1949-01-01 | ||||
Heinz Traser (until 1981-06-30) | 1953-01-04 | ||||
Ludwig Schuster (until 1978-06-30) | 1951-03-30 | ||||
Jovan Acimovic (until 1978-06-30) | 1948-06-21 | ||||
Dieter Finkler (until 1977-06-30) | 1952-11-10 | ||||
Methodije Spasovski (until 1977-06-30) | 1946-02-04 | ||||
Sturm | |||||
Peter Schmidt (until 1979-06-30) | 1951-04-24 | ||||
Roland Stegmayer (from 1976-12-01) (until 1978-06-30) | 1950-12-22 | ||||
Harry Ellbracht (from 1976-10-16) (until 1978-06-30) | 1953-09-13 | ||||
Peter Hayduk (until 1977-08-18) | 1953-04-10 | ||||
Marc Berdoll (until 1977-06-30) | 1953-04-06 | ||||
Werner Greth (until 1977-06-30) | 1951-06-17 | ||||
Fritz Kress (until 1977-06-30) | 1956-09-26 | ||||
Wolfgang Scherer (until 1977-06-30) | 1956-09-08 | ||||
Jurgen Marek (until 1976-11-30) | 1951-08-24 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Saturday, 1976-08-07 00:00 |
0 : 5 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 1976-10-16 00:00 |
0 : 3 |
Schema Compare |