Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Bernd Oles (from 1976-12-21) (until 1978-06-30) | 1921-01-15 | ||||
Reinhard Roder (until 1976-12-20) | 1941-07-06 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Kurt Goetz (until 1981-06-30) | 1954-03-03 | ||||
Manfred Behrendt (until 1977-06-30) | 1950-10-02 | ||||
Karl-Heinz Scherz (until 1977-06-30) | 1950-11-28 | ||||
Abwehr | |||||
Walter Gruler (until 1977-06-30) | 1951-08-24 | ||||
Helmut Hinberg (until 1977-06-30) | 1944-02-12 | ||||
Rainer Hollasch (until 1977-06-30) | 1951-03-19 | ||||
Lothar Hubner (until 1977-06-30) | 1950-02-14 | ||||
Harald Evers (until 1977-06-30) | 1947-01-03 | ||||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Detlef Wolter (until 1985-06-30) | 1955-12-20 | ||||
Bernd Brendel (until 1981-06-30) | 1949-04-21 | ||||
Gerd Muller (until 1977-06-30) | 1954-03-28 | ||||
Horst Hayer (until 1977-06-30) | 1953-09-30 | ||||
Jurgen Krawczyk (until 1977-06-30) | 1953-01-01 | ||||
Manfred Zindel (until 1977-06-30) | 1951-10-16 | ||||
Dieter Hochheimer (until 1976-11-30) | 1952-09-24 | ||||
Sturm | |||||
Wilhelm Dybowski (until 1982-06-30) | 1954-01-06 | ||||
Bernd Krech (until 1978-06-30) | 1957-04-06 | ||||
Walter Plaggemeyer (until 1977-06-30) | 1949-11-25 | ||||
Uwe Dreyer (until 1977-06-30) | 1952-08-14 | ||||
Urban Klausmann (until 1977-06-30) | 1952-06-29 | ||||
Michael Bordt (until 1977-06-30) | 1956-08-18 | ||||
Wilfried Klinge (until 1977-06-30) | 1950-08-15 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Wednesday, 1976-09-01 00:00 |
2 : 1 |
Schema Compare |