Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Otto Rehhagel (until 1978-04-30) | 1938-08-09 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Horst Bertram (until 1983-06-30) | 1948-11-16 | ||||
Peter Endrulat (until 1978-06-30) | 1954-08-10 | ||||
Abwehr | |||||
Lothar Huber (until 1987-06-30) | 1952-05-05 | ||||
Hans-Joachim Wagner (until 1983-06-30) | 1955-01-31 | ||||
Friedhelm Schwarze (until 1977-06-30) | 1953-12-30 | ||||
Bernd Krauss (until 1977-06-30) | 1957-05-08 | ||||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Mirko Votava (until 1982-06-30) | 1956-04-25 | ||||
Herbert Meyer (until 1980-06-30) | 1948-06-12 | ||||
Klaus Ackermann (until 1979-06-30) | 1946-03-20 | ||||
Egwin Wolf (until 1979-06-30) | 1951-01-28 | ||||
Helmut Nerlinger (until 1978-06-30) | 1948-02-27 | ||||
Gerd Kasperski (until 1977-06-30) | 1949-12-25 | ||||
Peter Frassmann (until 1977-06-30) | 1958-07-20 | ||||
Sturm | |||||
Manfred Burgsmuller (from 1976-10-24) (until 1983-06-30) | 1949-12-22 | ||||
Peter Geyer (until 1981-08-31) | 1952-12-11 | ||||
Wolfgang Voge (until 1980-06-30) | 1955-09-15 | ||||
Burkhard Segler (until 1979-10-31) | 1951-03-05 | ||||
Ente Lippens (until 1979-04-04) | 1945-11-10 | ||||
Erwin Kostedde (until 1978-06-30) | 1946-05-21 | ||||
Dietmar Otto (until 1978-06-30) | 1955-11-04 | ||||
Hans-Werner Hartl (until 1977-09-30) | 1946-11-10 | ||||
Hans-Gerd Schildt (until 1977-06-30) | 1952-06-12 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Saturday, 1976-08-07 00:00 |
10 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 1976-10-16 00:00 |
0 : 0 a.e.t. |
Schema Compare |
||
Tuesday, 1976-11-09 00:00 |
2 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 1976-12-18 00:00 |
3 : 1 a.e.t. |
Schema Compare |