Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Udo Lattek (until 1979-06-30) | 1935-01-16 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Ulrich Sude (until 1986-12-31) | 1956-04-19 | ||||
Wolfgang Kneib (until 1980-06-30) | 1952-11-20 | ||||
Wolfgang Kleff (until 1979-06-30) | 1946-11-16 | ||||
Hans-Jakob Klingen (until 1977-06-30) | 1957-01-10 | ||||
Abwehr | |||||
Wilfried Hannes (until 1986-06-30) | 1957-05-17 | ||||
Norbert Ringels (until 1985-06-30) | 1956-09-16 | ||||
Frank Schaffer (until 1983-06-30) | 1952-07-06 | ||||
Hans Klinkhammer (until 1980-06-30) | 1953-08-23 | ||||
Berti Vogts (until 1979-06-30) | 1946-12-30 | ||||
Hans-Jurgen Wittkamp (until 1978-06-30) | 1947-07-23 | ||||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Christian Kulik (until 1981-06-30) | 1952-12-06 | ||||
Dietmar Danner (until 1980-06-30) | 1950-11-29 | ||||
Horst Wohlers (until 1979-11-30) | 1949-08-06 | ||||
Herbert Wimmer (until 1978-06-30) | 1944-11-09 | ||||
Rainer Bonhof (until 1978-06-30) | 1952-03-29 | ||||
Gert Engels (until 1978-06-30) | 1957-04-26 | ||||
Hans-Jurgen Offermanns (until 1977-06-30) | 1957-03-16 | ||||
Uli Stielike (until 1977-06-30) | 1954-11-15 | ||||
Horst Koppel (from 1976-08-01) (until 1977-05-31) | 1948-05-17 | ||||
Sturm | |||||
Kalle Del'Haye (until 1980-06-30) | 1955-08-18 | ||||
Rudi Gores (until 1980-06-30) | 1957-09-05 | ||||
Allan Simonsen (until 1979-06-30) | 1952-12-15 | ||||
Jupp Heynckes (until 1978-06-30) | 1945-05-09 | ||||
Carsten Nielsen (until 1978-06-30) | 1955-08-12 | ||||
Herbert Heidenreich (until 1977-09-30) | 1954-11-15 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Tuesday, 1976-09-07 00:00 |
0 : 2 |
Schema Compare |