Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Ernst-Gunter Habig (until 1977-11-30) | 1935-09-14 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Arno Domgorgen (until 1980-06-30) | 1956-02-28 | ||||
Helmut Pabst (until 1977-06-30) | 1951-04-29 | ||||
Abwehr | |||||
Hans-Gunther Kroth (until 1979-06-30) | 1949-02-22 | ||||
Peter Boers (until 1979-06-30) | 1946-11-24 | ||||
Walter Muller (until 1978-06-30) | 1954-03-28 | ||||
Rolf Dohmen (until 1977-11-30) | 1952-04-04 | ||||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Hannes Linssen (until 1984-06-30) | 1949-09-28 | ||||
Jochen Goll (until 1981-06-30) | 1955-02-11 | ||||
Horst-Franz Degen (until 1980-06-30) | 1954-11-07 | ||||
Noel Campbell (until 1978-06-30) | 1949-12-11 | ||||
Roland Hattenberger (until 1977-06-30) | 1948-12-07 | ||||
Sturm | |||||
Karl-Heinz Modrath (until 1982-06-30) | 1951-09-22 | ||||
Friedhelm Otters (until 1979-06-30) | 1948-07-12 | ||||
Otmar Ludwig (until 1979-06-30) | 1951-04-22 | ||||
Reinhard Majgl (until 1978-06-30) | 1949-12-04 | ||||
Lothar Wesseler (until 1978-06-30) | 1954-01-21 | ||||
Klaus-Dieter Bone (until 1977-06-30) | 1954-08-09 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Friday, 1976-08-06 00:00 |
4 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Friday, 1976-10-15 00:00 |
1 : 2 a.e.t. |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 1976-12-18 00:00 |
4 : 0 |
Schema Compare |