Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Dietrich Weise (until 1978-06-30) | 1934-11-21 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Jorg Daniel (until 1981-06-30) | 1951-07-09 | ||||
Wilfried Woyke (until 1979-06-30) | 1944-05-12 | ||||
Abwehr | |||||
Egon Kohnen (until 1981-06-30) | 1947-11-24 | ||||
Heiner Baltes (until 1981-06-30) | 1949-08-19 | ||||
Gerd Zimmermann (until 1980-06-30) | 1949-09-26 | ||||
Fred Hesse (until 1977-06-30) | 1942-10-19 | ||||
Werner Kriegler (until 1977-06-30) | 1946-10-03 | ||||
Gerhard Busch (until 1977-06-30) | 1957-09-07 | ||||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Gerd Zewe (until 1987-06-30) | 1950-06-13 | ||||
Rudi Bommer (until 1985-06-30) | 1957-08-19 | ||||
Dieter Brei (until 1981-06-30) | 1950-09-30 | ||||
Hubert Schmitz (until 1981-06-30) | 1955-04-15 | ||||
Josef Hickersberger (until 1978-06-30) | 1948-04-27 | ||||
Sturm | |||||
Wolfgang Seel (until 1982-06-30) | 1948-06-21 | ||||
Klaus Allofs (until 1981-06-30) | 1956-12-05 | ||||
Detlev Szymanek (from 1976-11-01) (until 1978-09-30) | 1954-04-16 | ||||
Reiner Geye (until 1977-06-30) | 1949-11-22 | ||||
Jan Mattsson (until 1976-10-31) | 1951-04-17 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Saturday, 1976-08-07 00:00 |
3 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 1976-10-16 00:00 |
2 : 4 a.e.t. |
Schema Compare |