Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Milovan Beljin (until 1978-06-30) | 1936-09-07 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Karlheinz Volz (until 1980-06-30) | 1947-03-30 | ||||
Jurgen Grun (until 1980-06-30) | 1944-04-10 | ||||
Abwehr | |||||
Roland Hofling (until 1982-06-30) | 1954-06-09 | ||||
Hubert Klein (until 1981-06-30) | 1955-08-31 | ||||
Peter Rubenach (until 1980-06-30) | 1947-09-16 | ||||
Bernd Schmidt (until 1980-06-30) | 1955-11-07 | ||||
Peter Koch (until 1979-06-30) | 1950-11-03 | ||||
Klaus-Peter Stahl (until 1978-06-30) | 1946-05-28 | ||||
Dieter Gebert (until 1977-06-30) | 1953-11-14 | ||||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Paul Bajlitz (until 1979-06-30) | 1951-12-26 | ||||
Richard Engel (until 1979-06-30) | 1946-10-02 | ||||
Erwin Hofer (until 1979-06-30) | 1957-08-11 | ||||
Heinz-Rudolf Weiler (from 1976-10-01) (until 1978-10-31) | 1955-07-06 | ||||
Horst Trimhold (until 1978-06-30) | 1941-02-04 | ||||
Karl Walter (until 1978-06-30) | 1950-02-08 | ||||
Gabor Zele (until 1978-06-30) | 1954-07-08 | ||||
Gunter Kirch (until 1977-06-30) | 1948-10-01 | ||||
Sturm | |||||
Werner Hofmann (until 1981-06-30) | 1951-08-31 | ||||
Thomas Reitz (until 1978-06-30) | 1957-08-10 | ||||
Hubert Genz (until 1977-06-30) | 1949-09-03 | ||||
Gerhard Lenz (until 1977-06-30) | 1952-04-07 | ||||
Wolfgang Metzler (until 1976-10-31) | 1952-06-23 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Saturday, 1976-10-16 00:00 |
2 : 1 a.e.t. |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 1976-12-18 00:00 |
1 : 0 |
Schema Compare |