Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Georg Kessler (until 1977-06-30) | 1932-09-23 | ||||
Co-Trainer | |||||
Hans Eder (until 1979-10-27) | 1934-11-14 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Manfred Werner (until 1984-06-30) | 1951-02-02 | ||||
Norbert Nigbur (until 1979-06-30) | 1948-05-08 | ||||
Horst Wolter (until 1977-06-30) | 1942-06-08 | ||||
Abwehr | |||||
Holger Bruck (until 1981-06-30) | 1947-09-30 | ||||
Jurgen Diefenbach (until 1981-06-30) | 1956-03-27 | ||||
Uwe Kliemann (until 1980-06-30) | 1949-06-30 | ||||
Michael Sziedat (until 1980-06-30) | 1952-08-22 | ||||
Hans-Joachim Forster (until 1980-06-30) | 1955-08-01 | ||||
Hans Weiner (until 1979-06-30) | 1950-11-29 | ||||
Frank Hanisch (until 1977-06-30) | 1953-11-06 | ||||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Wolfgang Sidka (until 1980-06-30) | 1954-05-26 | ||||
Ole Rasmussen (until 1980-06-30) | 1952-03-19 | ||||
Erich Beer (until 1979-06-30) | 1946-12-09 | ||||
Bernd Gersdorff (from 1976-12-01) (until 1979-03-31) | 1946-11-18 | ||||
Heinz Grundel (until 1978-06-30) | 1957-02-13 | ||||
Jorgen Kristensen (until 1978-06-30) | 1946-12-12 | ||||
Erwin Hermandung (until 1977-06-30) | 1944-08-25 | ||||
Sturm | |||||
Dietmar Kramer (until 1980-06-30) | 1955-09-11 | ||||
Karl-Heinz Granitza (from 1976-09-13) (until 1978-12-31) | 1951-11-01 | ||||
Gerhard Grau (until 1978-06-30) | 1947-10-27 | ||||
Lorenz Horr (until 1977-06-30) | 1942-09-27 | ||||
Detlev Szymanek (until 1976-10-31) | 1954-04-16 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Saturday, 1976-08-07 00:00 |
7 : 3 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 1976-10-16 00:00 |
3 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 1976-12-18 00:00 |
0 : 1 a.e.t. |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 1977-01-08 00:00 |
1 : 2 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 1977-02-19 00:00 |
4 : 2 a.e.t. |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 1977-04-09 00:00 |
0 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 1977-05-28 00:00 |
1 : 1 a.e.t. |
Schema Compare |
||
Monday, 1977-05-30 00:00 |
1 : 0 |
Schema Compare |