Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Udo Klug (from 1976-11-01) (until 1978-06-30) | 1928-07-21 | ||||
Tschik Cajkovski (until 1976-10-31) | 1923-11-24 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Wilfried Kohls (until 1982-06-30) | 1950-10-12 | ||||
Bernd Helmschrot (until 1979-06-30) | 1947-03-18 | ||||
Abwehr | |||||
Bernd Walz (until 1983-06-30) | 1957-10-15 | ||||
Peter Berg (until 1980-06-30) | 1955-01-07 | ||||
Josef Domes (until 1980-06-30) | 1953-10-21 | ||||
Amand Theis (until 1977-06-30) | 1949-11-19 | ||||
Wolfgang Rausch (until 1977-06-30) | 1947-04-30 | ||||
Lothar Skala (until 1977-06-30) | 1952-05-02 | ||||
Gernot Rohr (until 1977-06-30) | 1953-06-28 | ||||
Volker Fass (until 1977-06-30) | 1952-02-06 | ||||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Hermann Bitz (until 1979-06-30) | 1950-09-21 | ||||
Bernd Nathmann (until 1979-06-30) | 1959-07-14 | ||||
Rainer Blechschmidt (until 1978-06-30) | 1953-12-20 | ||||
Gunter Oleknavicius (until 1977-06-30) | 1950-02-21 | ||||
Zlatan Cajkovski (until 1977-06-30) | 1954-08-03 | ||||
Sturm | |||||
Walter Krause (until 1984-06-30) | 1953-05-08 | ||||
Alfred Seiler (from 1976-12-15) (until 1979-06-30) | 1950-12-18 | ||||
Sigfried Held (until 1977-06-30) | 1942-08-07 | ||||
Lars Bastrup (until 1977-06-30) | 1955-07-31 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Friday, 1976-08-06 00:00 |
4 : 4 a.e.t. |
Schema Compare |
||
Wednesday, 1976-09-01 00:00 |
4 : 1 |
Schema Compare |