Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Otto Knefler (until 1978-06-30) | 1923-09-05 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Gerhard Heinze (until 1983-06-30) | 1948-11-30 | ||||
Wolfgang Schreiner (until 1982-06-30) | 1957-04-11 | ||||
Friedel Schuller (until 1977-06-30) | 1953-11-01 | ||||
Abwehr | |||||
Bernard Dietz (until 1982-06-30) | 1948-03-22 | ||||
Norbert Dronia (until 1980-06-30) | 1957-10-19 | ||||
Kees Bregman (until 1979-06-30) | 1947-08-08 | ||||
Michael Bella (until 1978-06-30) | 1945-09-29 | ||||
Detlef Pirsig (until 1977-06-30) | 1945-10-22 | ||||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Herbert Bussers (until 1984-06-30) | 1949-10-30 | ||||
Norbert Fruck (until 1983-06-30) | 1957-12-28 | ||||
Kurt Jara (until 1980-06-30) | 1950-10-14 | ||||
Theo Bucker (until 1978-06-30) | 1948-07-10 | ||||
Ulrich Hintzen (until 1978-06-30) | 1957-09-02 | ||||
Jurgen Suchanek (until 1978-06-30) | 1955-03-24 | ||||
Klaus Bruckmann (until 1977-06-30) | 1953-10-09 | ||||
Werner Schneider (until 1977-06-30) | 1954-07-26 | ||||
Sturm | |||||
Rudolf Seliger (until 1983-06-30) | 1951-09-20 | ||||
Ronnie Worm (until 1979-06-30) | 1953-10-07 | ||||
Gunter Weber (until 1979-06-30) | 1952-07-11 | ||||
Klaus Thies (until 1977-06-30) | 1950-10-25 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Friday, 1976-08-06 00:00 |
0 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 1976-10-16 00:00 |
0 : 4 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 1976-12-18 00:00 |
4 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 1977-01-08 00:00 |
1 : 2 |
Schema Compare |