Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Siegfried Stark (from 1977-03-01) (until 1977-06-30) | 1940-02-17 | ||||
Heinz Elzner (until 1977-02-28) | 1928-12-04 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Norbert Kleider (until 1979-06-30) | 1951-09-02 | ||||
Manfred Seifert (until 1978-06-30) | 1949-04-22 | ||||
Abwehr | |||||
Lothar Wolf (until 1979-07-01) | 1951-09-16 | ||||
Franz Durrschmidt (until 1979-06-30) | 1947-11-07 | ||||
Rudolf Fichtner (until 1979-06-30) | 1951-10-11 | ||||
Helmut Achatz (until 1977-06-30) | 1948-10-20 | ||||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Werner Thuroff (until 1983-06-30) | 1955-03-08 | ||||
Klaus Klein (until 1978-06-30) | 1950-08-27 | ||||
Klaus-Ulrich Blumig (until 1978-06-30) | 1952-12-05 | ||||
August Deutscher (until 1978-06-30) | 1950-12-15 | ||||
Hans-Oskar Feulner (until 1978-06-30) | 1954-01-18 | ||||
Gerhard Wohnsland (until 1978-06-30) | 1957-12-27 | ||||
Siegfried Sieber (until 1977-06-30) | 1943-10-07 | ||||
Siegfried Stark (until 1977-04-30) | 1940-02-17 | ||||
Sturm | |||||
Hartmut Werner (until 1979-06-30) | 1949-07-18 | ||||
Reinhard Lippert (until 1978-06-30) | 1948-02-27 | ||||
Gunther Michl (until 1978-06-30) | 1950-05-30 | ||||
Jose Diaz (until 1978-06-30) | 1955-04-24 | ||||
Karl-Heinz Zapf (until 1978-06-30) | 1951-07-01 | ||||
Herbert Renner (until 1977-06-30) | 1946-09-28 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Saturday, 1976-08-07 00:00 |
3 : 2 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 1976-10-16 00:00 |
3 : 1 |
Schema Compare |