Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Gerhard Happ (until 1977-06-30) | 1939-08-10 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Wolfgang Mahr (until 1986-06-30) | 1952-09-26 | ||||
Wolfgang Hillmann (until 1977-06-30) | 1948-09-18 | ||||
Abwehr | |||||
Harald Bleckert (until 1982-06-30) | 1951-12-02 | ||||
Reinhard Brendel (until 1980-06-30) | 1956-12-21 | ||||
Georg Damjanoff (until 1977-06-30) | 1945-10-12 | ||||
Gerd Fink (until 1977-06-30) | 1955-12-08 | ||||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Harald Dollhopf (until 1985-06-30) | 1957-05-27 | ||||
Herbert Horn (until 1983-06-30) | 1949-01-21 | ||||
Wolfgang Breuer (until 1982-06-30) | 1944-05-24 | ||||
Klaus Brand (until 1980-06-30) | 1955-04-17 | ||||
Rolf Kaul (until 1980-06-30) | 1946-09-29 | ||||
Norbert Hofmann (until 1979-12-09) | 1951-08-14 | ||||
Gunther Weiss (until 1978-06-30) | 1955-02-01 | ||||
Paul Hupp (until 1978-06-30) | 1956-09-25 | ||||
Eberhard Lindner (until 1977-06-30) | 1942-10-19 | ||||
Sturm | |||||
Uwe Sommerer (until 1986-06-30) | 1954-07-02 | ||||
Manfred Grossler (until 1982-06-30) | 1944-10-03 | ||||
Gert Ockenfels (until 1977-10-31) | 1954-08-26 | ||||
Peter Sichmann (until 1977-06-30) | 1947-05-24 | ||||
Stjepan Milardovic (until 1977-06-30) | 1953-11-17 | ||||
Roland Hobner (until 1977-06-30) | 1953-12-06 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Friday, 1976-08-06 00:00 |
4 : 4 a.e.t. |
Schema Compare |
||
Wednesday, 1976-09-01 00:00 |
4 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 1976-10-16 00:00 |
2 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 1976-12-18 00:00 |
2 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 1977-01-08 00:00 |
2 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 1977-02-19 00:00 |
1 : 2 |
Schema Compare |