Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Herbert Binkert (until 1977-06-30) | 1923-09-03 | ||||
Co-Trainer | |||||
Horst Berg (until 1977-06-30) | 1941-09-08 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Jurgen Stars (until 1977-06-30) | 1948-06-24 | ||||
Abwehr | |||||
Hans-Werner Kremer (until 1981-06-30) | 1945-10-17 | ||||
Roland Latz (until 1980-06-30) | 1949-11-18 | ||||
Werner Martin (until 1977-06-30) | 1949-02-28 | ||||
Klaus Hommrich (until 1977-06-30) | 1950-10-17 | ||||
Gerd Paulus (until 1977-06-30) | 1953-12-31 | ||||
Horst Pleyer (until 1977-06-30) | 1952-08-02 | ||||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Walter Spohr (until 1981-06-30) | 1948-03-05 | ||||
Peter Piroth (until 1980-06-30) | 1951-10-19 | ||||
Gerd Werthmuller (until 1977-06-30) | 1948-11-04 | ||||
Jurgen Janz (until 1977-06-30) | 1950-11-30 | ||||
Ralf Schmitt (until 1977-06-30) | 1953-01-19 | ||||
Raimund Theobald (until 1977-06-30) | 1954-03-02 | ||||
Sturm | |||||
Horst Schauss (until 1977-06-30) | 1945-11-06 | ||||
Paul Scheermann (until 1977-06-30) | 1949-03-18 | ||||
Erwin Hohenwarter (until 1977-06-30) | 1947-12-01 | ||||
Gerd Warken (until 1977-06-30) | 1951-03-05 | ||||
Gerhard Weber (until 1977-06-30) | 1948-07-10 | ||||
Karl-Heinz Granitza (until 1976-09-12) | 1951-11-01 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Saturday, 1976-08-07 00:00 |
1 : 2 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 1976-10-17 00:00 |
2 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 1976-12-18 00:00 |
2 : 3 |
Schema Compare |