Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Hans Tilkowski (until 1977-12-19) | 1935-07-12 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Dieter Burdenski (until 1988-06-30) | 1950-11-26 | ||||
Albert Voss (until 1981-06-30) | 1951-09-08 | ||||
Abwehr | |||||
Karl-Heinz Kamp (until 1985-06-30) | 1946-09-26 | ||||
Karlheinz Geils (until 1980-06-30) | 1955-05-20 | ||||
Per Rontved (until 1979-06-30) | 1949-01-27 | ||||
Horst-Dieter Hottges (until 1978-06-30) | 1943-09-10 | ||||
Mario Kontny (until 1977-06-30) | 1953-04-07 | ||||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Norbert Siegmann (until 1985-06-30) | 1953-05-20 | ||||
Uwe Bracht (until 1984-06-30) | 1953-07-10 | ||||
Franz Hiller (until 1980-06-30) | 1950-10-22 | ||||
Jurgen Rober (until 1980-06-30) | 1953-12-25 | ||||
Ibrahim Sunday (until 1977-06-30) | 1944-07-22 | ||||
Miodrag Petrovic (until 1977-06-30) | 1946-11-16 | ||||
Sturm | |||||
Werner Gorts (until 1978-06-30) | 1942-01-15 | ||||
Karlheinz Meininger (until 1978-06-30) | 1953-02-01 | ||||
Wilhelm Mense (until 1978-06-30) | 1957-09-08 | ||||
Werner Weist (until 1977-06-30) | 1949-03-11 | ||||
Volker Ohling (until 1977-06-30) | 1955-01-17 | ||||
Dimitrios Daras (until 1977-06-30) | 1956-04-21 | ||||
Hartmut Konschal (until 1977-06-30) | 1953-04-02 | ||||
Jens Knop (until 1977-06-30) | 1952-06-21 | ||||
Georg Mullner (until 1976-08-31) | 1953-10-24 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Saturday, 1976-08-07 00:00 |
4 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 1976-10-16 00:00 |
4 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 1976-12-18 00:00 |
3 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 1977-01-08 00:00 |
2 : 0 |
Schema Compare |