Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Erich Ribbeck (until 1978-06-30) | 1937-06-13 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Ronnie Hellstrom (until 1984-06-30) | 1949-02-21 | ||||
Josef Stabel (until 1980-06-30) | 1948-09-21 | ||||
Abwehr | |||||
Wolfgang Wolf (until 1988-06-30) | 1957-09-24 | ||||
Hans-Peter Briegel (until 1984-06-30) | 1955-10-11 | ||||
Hans-Gunter Neues (from 1977-12-05) (until 1983-06-30) | 1950-11-14 | ||||
Reinhard Meier (until 1981-06-30) | 1946-03-11 | ||||
Peter Schwarz (until 1980-06-30) | 1953-06-14 | ||||
Jurgen Groh (until 1980-06-30) | 1956-07-17 | ||||
Ernst Diehl (until 1978-06-30) | 1949-03-28 | ||||
Manfred Ritschel (until 1977-09-30) | 1946-06-07 | ||||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Werner Melzer (until 1986-06-30) | 1954-05-02 | ||||
Johannes Riedl (until 1981-06-30) | 1950-01-02 | ||||
Uwe Mackensen (until 1979-06-30) | 1955-08-12 | ||||
Heinz Wilhelmi (until 1978-06-30) | 1954-08-19 | ||||
Helmut Nickel (until 1978-06-30) | 1956-05-12 | ||||
Heinz Stickel (until 1978-06-30) | 1949-05-09 | ||||
Gunter Menges (until 1978-06-30) | 1954-02-11 | ||||
Sturm | |||||
Reiner Geye (until 1981-06-30) | 1949-11-22 | ||||
Benny Wendt (until 1981-06-30) | 1950-11-04 | ||||
Klaus Toppmoller (until 1980-04-30) | 1951-08-12 | ||||
Josef Pirrung (until 1978-06-30) | 1949-07-24 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Saturday, 1977-07-30 00:00 |
0 : 3 |
Schema Compare |
||
Friday, 1977-08-19 00:00 |
4 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 1977-10-15 00:00 |
2 : 1 |
Schema Compare |