Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Werner Kern (from 1978-05-20) (until 1978-12-20) | 1946-02-23 | ||||
Horst Buhtz (until 1978-05-19) | 1923-09-21 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Gerhard Hummel (until 1979-06-30) | 1953-08-22 | ||||
Manfred Muller (until 1979-04-08) | 1947-07-28 | ||||
Abwehr | |||||
Horst Weyerich (until 1985-06-30) | 1957-08-13 | ||||
Norbert Eder (until 1984-06-30) | 1955-11-07 | ||||
Peter Stocker (until 1983-06-30) | 1953-06-30 | ||||
Bertram Beierlorzer (until 1981-06-30) | 1957-05-31 | ||||
Jurgen Tauber (until 1980-12-31) | 1955-04-12 | ||||
Hans Pausch (until 1979-10-31) | 1957-09-09 | ||||
Gunter Dampfling (until 1979-08-31) | 1956-01-11 | ||||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Dieter Lieberwirth (until 1988-12-31) | 1954-01-13 | ||||
Reinhold Scholl (until 1982-06-30) | 1955-10-23 | ||||
Slobodan Petrovic (until 1979-06-30) | 1948-10-02 | ||||
Sturm | |||||
Klaus Tauber (until 1980-08-21) | 1958-01-17 | ||||
Hans Walitza (until 1979-06-30) | 1945-11-26 | ||||
Peter Sommer (until 1979-06-30) | 1957-12-06 | ||||
Miodrag Zivaljevic (until 1979-06-30) | 1951-09-09 | ||||
Alfred Steinkirchner (until 1978-10-31) | 1956-10-23 | ||||
Siegfried Susser (until 1978-10-31) | 1953-07-12 | ||||
Werner Dorok (until 1978-06-30) | 1957-08-19 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Saturday, 1977-07-30 00:00 |
2 : 1 |
Schema Compare |