Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Hans Tilkowski (from 1978-02-22) (until 1978-06-30) | 1935-07-12 | ||||
Manfred Krafft (until 1978-02-21) | 1937-12-11 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Dieter Ferner (until 1980-06-30) | 1949-01-16 | ||||
Norbert Sauer (until 1979-06-30) | 1949-12-16 | ||||
Abwehr | |||||
Ernst Traser (until 1985-06-30) | 1953-01-04 | ||||
Egon Schmitt (until 1982-06-30) | 1948-11-12 | ||||
Horst Bender (until 1979-06-30) | 1954-11-11 | ||||
Reinhold Zech (until 1979-06-30) | 1948-05-27 | ||||
Niko Semlitsch (until 1978-06-30) | 1946-11-27 | ||||
Bernd Forster (until 1978-06-30) | 1956-05-03 | ||||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Ludwig Denz (until 1981-06-30) | 1949-01-01 | ||||
Heinz Traser (until 1981-06-30) | 1953-01-04 | ||||
Werner Lorant (until 1978-06-30) | 1948-11-21 | ||||
Ludwig Schuster (until 1978-06-30) | 1951-03-30 | ||||
Jovan Acimovic (until 1978-06-30) | 1948-06-21 | ||||
Frank Roeser (until 1978-06-30) | 1957-09-14 | ||||
Sturm | |||||
Werner Heck (until 1980-06-30) | 1955-04-21 | ||||
Konrad Eickels (until 1980-06-30) | 1956-06-11 | ||||
Peter Schmidt (until 1979-06-30) | 1951-04-24 | ||||
Peter Frenzle (until 1979-06-30) | 1959-06-03 | ||||
Roland Stegmayer (until 1978-06-30) | 1950-12-22 | ||||
Harry Ellbracht (until 1978-06-30) | 1953-09-13 | ||||
Peter Hayduk (until 1977-08-18) | 1953-04-10 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Wednesday, 1977-08-10 00:00 |
1 : 2 |
Schema Compare |