Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Willi Haag (from 1978-05-11) (until 1978-06-30) | 1944-08-06 | ||||
Gerhard Prokop (until 1978-05-10) | 1939-05-18 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Johannes Kau (until 1991-06-30) | 1957-04-10 | ||||
Ulrich Gelhard (until 1978-06-30) | 1946-05-26 | ||||
Abwehr | |||||
Jo Montanes (until 1985-06-30) | 1953-08-15 | ||||
Werner Malischke (until 1983-06-30) | 1961-12-07 | ||||
Josef Blaser (until 1979-06-30) | 1952-12-11 | ||||
Willi Reuter (until 1979-06-30) | 1953-07-23 | ||||
Peter Stollwerk (until 1978-06-30) | 1949-08-05 | ||||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Manfred Jansen (until 1984-06-30) | 1956-11-06 | ||||
Helmut Schutt (until 1984-06-30) | 1950-09-14 | ||||
Helmut Balke (from 1977-08-01) (until 1983-06-30) | 1949-11-22 | ||||
Michael Schleiden (until 1981-06-30) | 1954-10-14 | ||||
Stefan Rausch (until 1980-06-30) | 1959-10-05 | ||||
Wolfgang Glock (until 1979-06-30) | 1946-05-26 | ||||
Karl-Heinz Haymann (until 1978-12-31) | 1952-05-05 | ||||
Heiko Mertes (until 1978-12-02) | 1947-07-14 | ||||
Franz-Josef Breuer (until 1978-06-30) | 1948-09-09 | ||||
Werner Brodermanns (until 1978-06-30) | 1957-10-22 | ||||
Heinz Otten (until 1978-06-30) | 1953-09-13 | ||||
Holger Zippel (until 1978-06-30) | 1953-12-04 | ||||
Antoine Fagot (until 1977-11-30) | 1956-07-24 | ||||
Sturm | |||||
Tim Gerhards (until 2016-06-30) | 1995-03-13 | ||||
Rolf Kucharski (until 1980-06-30) | 1948-04-19 | ||||
Christian van Dyk (until 1979-06-30) | 1950-07-29 | ||||
Klaus-Dieter Bone (until 1978-06-30) | 1954-08-09 | ||||
Hans Schefczyk (until 1978-06-30) | 1953-10-26 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Saturday, 1977-07-30 00:00 |
2 : 3 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 1977-08-20 00:00 |
3 : 0 |
Schema Compare |