Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Willibert Kremer (until 1981-11-22) | 1939-10-15 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Fred-Werner Bockholt (until 1981-06-30) | 1943-06-24 | ||||
Hubert Makel (until 1981-06-30) | 1945-09-12 | ||||
Abwehr | |||||
Thomas Horster (until 1991-06-30) | 1956-11-27 | ||||
Jurgen Gelsdorf (until 1986-06-30) | 1953-01-19 | ||||
Walter Posner (until 1984-06-30) | 1953-02-22 | ||||
Andreas Fehse (until 1983-06-30) | 1958-11-01 | ||||
Peter Klimke (until 1982-06-30) | 1952-09-01 | ||||
Hans-Jurgen Scheinert (until 1981-06-30) | 1954-10-05 | ||||
Manfred Eickerling (until 1978-06-30) | 1951-09-13 | ||||
Willi Rehbach (until 1978-06-30) | 1945-12-25 | ||||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Peter Hermann (until 1984-06-30) | 1952-03-22 | ||||
Klaus Bruckmann (until 1982-06-30) | 1953-10-09 | ||||
Harry Gniech (until 1981-06-30) | 1951-10-14 | ||||
Norbert Ziegler (until 1980-11-20) | 1953-08-14 | ||||
Bernd Elfering (until 1978-09-30) | 1956-10-09 | ||||
Theodor Rielander (until 1978-06-30) | 1950-07-24 | ||||
Sturm | |||||
Dieter Herzog (until 1983-06-30) | 1946-07-15 | ||||
Matthias Brucken (until 1980-06-30) | 1953-07-23 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Saturday, 1977-07-30 00:00 |
5 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 1977-08-20 00:00 |
3 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 1977-10-15 00:00 |
1 : 5 |
Schema Compare |