Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Dietrich Weise (until 1978-06-30) | 1934-11-21 | ||||
Co-Trainer | |||||
Hans-Dieter Tippenhauer (until 1978-06-30) | 1943-10-16 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Jorg Daniel (until 1981-06-30) | 1951-07-09 | ||||
Wilfried Woyke (until 1979-06-30) | 1944-05-12 | ||||
Abwehr | |||||
Egon Kohnen (until 1981-06-30) | 1947-11-24 | ||||
Heiner Baltes (until 1981-06-30) | 1949-08-19 | ||||
Gerd Zimmermann (until 1980-06-30) | 1949-09-26 | ||||
Reinhold Fanz (until 1979-06-30) | 1954-01-16 | ||||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Josef Weikl (until 1988-06-30) | 1954-01-15 | ||||
Gerd Zewe (until 1987-06-30) | 1950-06-13 | ||||
Rudi Bommer (until 1985-06-30) | 1957-08-19 | ||||
Dieter Brei (until 1981-06-30) | 1950-09-30 | ||||
Hubert Schmitz (until 1981-06-30) | 1955-04-15 | ||||
Herbert Zimmer (until 1979-06-30) | 1953-02-12 | ||||
Ralf Dusend (until 1978-06-30) | 1959-09-28 | ||||
Josef Hickersberger (until 1978-06-30) | 1948-04-27 | ||||
Sturm | |||||
Wolfgang Seel (until 1982-06-30) | 1948-06-21 | ||||
Thomas Allofs (until 1982-06-30) | 1959-11-17 | ||||
Klaus Allofs (until 1981-06-30) | 1956-12-05 | ||||
Flemming Lund (until 1979-06-30) | 1952-10-06 | ||||
Detlev Szymanek (until 1978-09-30) | 1954-04-16 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Saturday, 1977-07-30 00:00 |
1 : 6 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 1977-08-20 00:00 |
3 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 1977-10-15 00:00 |
4 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 1977-11-19 00:00 |
3 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Tuesday, 1977-12-20 00:00 |
1 : 1 a.e.t. |
Schema Compare |
||
Monday, 1977-12-26 00:00 |
1 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Wednesday, 1978-01-25 00:00 |
4 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 1978-04-15 00:00 |
2 : 0 |
Schema Compare |