Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Udo Klug (until 1978-06-30) | 1928-07-21 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Wilfried Kohls (until 1982-06-30) | 1950-10-12 | ||||
Bernd Helmschrot (until 1979-06-30) | 1947-03-18 | ||||
Abwehr | |||||
Gerd Paulus (until 1989-06-30) | 1953-12-31 | ||||
Kurt Geinzer (until 1983-06-30) | 1948-07-03 | ||||
Bernd Walz (until 1983-06-30) | 1957-10-15 | ||||
Peter Berg (until 1980-06-30) | 1955-01-07 | ||||
Josef Domes (until 1980-06-30) | 1953-10-21 | ||||
Ulrich Pechtold (until 1979-06-30) | 1952-07-24 | ||||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Udo Lasch (until 1980-12-31) | 1951-10-03 | ||||
Hermann Bitz (until 1979-06-30) | 1950-09-21 | ||||
Stefan Lottermann (until 1979-06-30) | 1959-03-05 | ||||
Bernd Nathmann (until 1979-06-30) | 1959-07-14 | ||||
Rainer Blechschmidt (until 1978-06-30) | 1953-12-20 | ||||
Thomas Kroth (until 1978-06-30) | 1959-08-26 | ||||
Gerd Muller (until 1978-06-30) | 1954-03-28 | ||||
Hubert Gohler (until 1978-06-30) | 1959-06-12 | ||||
Bernd Rudolf (until 1978-06-30) | 1950-05-02 | ||||
Sturm | |||||
Walter Krause (until 1984-06-30) | 1953-05-08 | ||||
Rudi Voller (until 1980-06-30) | 1960-04-13 | ||||
Walter Plaggemeyer (until 1979-06-30) | 1949-11-25 | ||||
Alfred Seiler (until 1979-06-30) | 1950-12-18 | ||||
Frank-Michael Schonert (until 1978-06-30) | 1951-08-30 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Saturday, 1977-07-30 00:00 |
0 : 4 |
Schema Compare |