Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Egon Coordes (until 1979-11-21) | 1944-07-13 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Erich Busch (until 1982-06-30) | 1954-04-28 | ||||
Hans Grommes (until 1978-06-30) | 1951-07-11 | ||||
Abwehr | |||||
Manfred Graber (until 1982-06-30) | 1953-01-03 | ||||
Ralf Steinlein (until 1980-06-30) | 1951-08-21 | ||||
Helmut Trenke (until 1980-06-30) | 1956-08-09 | ||||
Heiko Schnaars (until 1979-06-30) | 1956-05-05 | ||||
Lothar Lazar (until 1978-06-30) | 1947-05-20 | ||||
Frank-Michael Marczewski (from 1977-12-01) (until 1978-06-30) | 1954-04-30 | ||||
Frank Meyer (until 1978-06-30) | 1957-12-21 | ||||
John Nielsen (until 1978-06-30) | 1946-03-26 | ||||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Rolf Kaemmer (until 1981-06-30) | 1949-03-25 | ||||
Peter Freund (until 1980-06-30) | 1953-11-24 | ||||
Bernd Brexendorf (until 1978-06-30) | 1954-10-21 | ||||
Gunter Diekmann (until 1978-06-30) | 1954-09-22 | ||||
Vitomir Rogoznica (until 1978-06-30) | 1955-10-27 | ||||
Sturm | |||||
Mohammed Amiq (until 1981-06-30) | 1949-07-07 | ||||
Uwe Dreyer (until 1980-06-30) | 1952-08-14 | ||||
Siegmund Marsollek (until 1980-06-30) | 1956-12-13 | ||||
Wilfried Zander (until 1980-06-30) | 1956-06-03 | ||||
Volker Ohling (until 1979-06-30) | 1955-01-17 | ||||
Jurgen Brunhorn (until 1978-06-30) | 1956-11-30 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Saturday, 1977-07-30 00:00 |
3 : 2 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 1977-08-20 00:00 |
0 : 1 |
Schema Compare |