Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Dieter Tartemann (until 1978-06-30) | 1945-05-06 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Karl-Heinz Ach (until 1985-06-30) | 1952-11-16 | ||||
Friedhelm Trener (until 1979-06-30) | 1949-06-20 | ||||
Hans Wulf (until 1978-06-30) | 1951-10-31 | ||||
Abwehr | |||||
Roland Mattner (until 1982-06-30) | 1954-07-08 | ||||
Klaus Sikirski (until 1982-06-30) | 1952-06-10 | ||||
Klaus Kolbl (until 1981-06-30) | |||||
Willi Korth (until 1978-06-30) | 1955-04-12 | ||||
Peter Nover (until 1978-06-30) | 1949-07-18 | ||||
Jurgen Elm (until 1978-06-30) | 1952-06-24 | ||||
Sieghard Heise (until 1978-06-30) | 1954-12-20 | ||||
Detlef Wiemers (until 1978-01-08) | 1953-07-15 | ||||
Dietmar Klinger (until 1977-12-31) | 1958-01-08 | ||||
Eckhard Berlau-Kirschstein (until 1977-12-05) | 1953-07-05 | ||||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Hans-Gerd Florian (until 1982-06-30) | 1955-10-30 | ||||
Gunther Riepert (until 1982-06-30) | 1952-09-13 | ||||
Udo Schorning (until 1982-06-30) | 1950-08-14 | ||||
Manfred Nieswandt (until 1979-06-30) | 1948-04-03 | ||||
Sturm | |||||
Jurgen Kierdorf (until 1981-06-30) | 1951-10-15 | ||||
Manfred Priewe (until 1979-06-30) | 1953-02-02 | ||||
Artur Sieger (until 1979-06-30) | 1953-01-01 | ||||
Urban Klausmann (until 1978-06-30) | 1952-06-29 | ||||
Gerd Kruger (until 1978-06-30) | 1952-12-15 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Sunday, 1977-07-31 00:00 |
2 : 2 a.e.t. |
Schema Compare |
||
Wednesday, 1977-08-10 00:00 |
2 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 1977-08-20 00:00 |
2 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 1977-10-16 00:00 |
2 : 1 a.e.t. |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 1977-11-19 00:00 |
0 : 0 a.e.t. |
Schema Compare |
||
Wednesday, 1977-11-30 00:00 |
0 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Tuesday, 1977-12-20 00:00 |
9 : 0 |
Schema Compare |