Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Heinz Elzner (until 1980-05-09) | 1928-12-04 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Wolfgang Mahr (until 1986-06-30) | 1952-09-26 | ||||
Norbert Schumbrutzki (until 1981-06-30) | 1955-04-13 | ||||
Abwehr | |||||
Harald Bleckert (until 1982-06-30) | 1951-12-02 | ||||
Reinhard Brendel (until 1980-06-30) | 1956-12-21 | ||||
Rudolf Hannakampf (until 1980-06-30) | 1948-10-22 | ||||
Ronald Schwarz (until 1980-06-30) | 1957-08-23 | ||||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Harald Dollhopf (until 1985-06-30) | 1957-05-27 | ||||
Herbert Horn (until 1983-06-30) | 1949-01-21 | ||||
Wolfgang Breuer (until 1982-06-30) | 1944-05-24 | ||||
Klaus Brand (until 1980-06-30) | 1955-04-17 | ||||
Rolf Kaul (until 1980-06-30) | 1946-09-29 | ||||
Norbert Hofmann (until 1979-12-09) | 1951-08-14 | ||||
Gunther Weiss (until 1978-06-30) | 1955-02-01 | ||||
Paul Hupp (until 1978-06-30) | 1956-09-25 | ||||
Sturm | |||||
Uwe Sommerer (until 1986-06-30) | 1954-07-02 | ||||
Manfred Grossler (until 1982-06-30) | 1944-10-03 | ||||
Heinz Tochtermann (until 1979-09-30) | 1956-01-22 | ||||
Mogens Hansen (from 1977-08-01) (until 1979-06-30) | 1956-04-12 | ||||
Miroljub Bozoljac (until 1978-06-30) | 1951-07-19 | ||||
Gert Ockenfels (until 1977-10-31) | 1954-08-26 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Saturday, 1977-07-30 00:00 |
0 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 1977-08-20 00:00 |
1 : 6 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 1977-10-15 00:00 |
2 : 0 |
Schema Compare |