Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Horst Franz (until 1980-11-30) | 1940-06-17 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Helmut Pabst (until 1984-06-30) | 1951-04-29 | ||||
Helmut Traries (until 1979-06-30) | 1955-10-10 | ||||
Meinolf Schulte (until 1978-06-30) | 1948-06-28 | ||||
Abwehr | |||||
Dirk Hupe (until 1981-06-30) | 1957-05-29 | ||||
Wolfgang Fabian (until 1981-06-30) | 1948-12-06 | ||||
Karlheinz Hofer (until 1978-06-30) | 1950-01-07 | ||||
Edgar Evenkamp (until 1978-06-30) | 1947-04-01 | ||||
Alfred Haffner (until 1978-06-30) | 1949-04-12 | ||||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Wolfgang Kruger (until 1988-06-30) | 1953-11-29 | ||||
Vojin Jovanovic (until 1981-06-30) | 1949-12-20 | ||||
Peter Gorny (until 1980-06-30) | 1958-09-23 | ||||
Dieter Suchanek (from 1977-11-16) (until 1980-06-30) | 1952-09-07 | ||||
Norbert Lenzen (until 1978-06-30) | 1952-11-23 | ||||
Peter Feiten (until 1978-06-30) | 1952-02-05 | ||||
Horst Kuballa (until 1978-06-30) | 1952-11-06 | ||||
Wolfgang Schonberger (until 1978-06-30) | 1947-12-09 | ||||
Sturm | |||||
Werner Lenz (until 1983-06-30) | 1954-11-14 | ||||
Karl-Heinz Jonas (until 1979-06-30) | 1956-04-10 | ||||
Hans-Werner Hartl (from 1977-10-01) (until 1978-06-30) | 1946-11-10 | ||||
Hans Jurgen Lehr (until 1978-06-30) | 1947-09-25 | ||||
Hans-Gunther Plucken (until 1978-06-30) | 1954-11-15 | ||||
Volker Spazier (until 1977-10-31) | 1953-06-24 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Sunday, 1977-07-31 00:00 |
2 : 2 a.e.t. |
Schema Compare |
||
Wednesday, 1977-08-10 00:00 |
2 : 0 |
Schema Compare |