Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Peter Stubbe (from 1978-03-02) (until 1978-06-30) | |||||
Ivica Horvat (until 1978-03-01) | 1926-07-16 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Hans-Jurgen Bradler (until 1982-06-30) | 1948-08-12 | ||||
Lothar Matuschak (until 1980-06-30) | 1948-06-10 | ||||
Abwehr | |||||
Franz-Josef Laufer (until 1980-06-30) | 1952-09-01 | ||||
Klaus-Peter Kudella (until 1980-06-30) | 1949-03-07 | ||||
Werner Lappeneit (until 1980-06-30) | 1953-09-20 | ||||
Hartmut Fromm (from 1977-10-17) (until 1979-06-30) | 1950-10-15 | ||||
Bernhard Ochmann (until 1979-06-30) | 1952-01-09 | ||||
Gunter Kuczinski (until 1979-06-30) | 1954-09-07 | ||||
Soren Busk (until 1979-06-30) | 1953-04-10 | ||||
Laszlo Harsanyi (until 1978-06-30) | 1951-03-13 | ||||
Klaus Kacmierczak (until 1978-06-30) | 1949-05-18 | ||||
Hugo Lutkebohmert (until 1978-06-30) | 1949-06-02 | ||||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Hans-Gunter Etterich (until 1979-06-30) | 1951-08-16 | ||||
Klaus Scheer (until 1979-06-30) | 1950-10-04 | ||||
Lutz Gerresheim (until 1979-06-30) | 1958-09-19 | ||||
Herbert Bals (until 1979-06-30) | 1949-03-14 | ||||
Reinhard Klose (until 1979-06-30) | 1957-08-24 | ||||
Hartmut Sinnigen (until 1979-06-30) | 1952-08-15 | ||||
Uwe Hofer (until 1978-06-30) | 1959-07-21 | ||||
Albert Leder (until 1977-12-31) | 1952-04-26 | ||||
Sturm | |||||
Rainer Fischer (until 1979-06-30) | 1953-08-28 | ||||
Karl-Heinz Brucken (until 1978-06-30) | 1947-09-24 | ||||
Norbert Elgert (until 1978-06-30) | 1957-01-13 | ||||
Hans-Joachim Abel (until 1977-10-25) | 1952-06-25 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Sunday, 1977-07-31 00:00 |
6 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 1977-08-20 00:00 |
1 : 3 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 1977-10-15 00:00 |
1 : 5 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 1977-11-19 00:00 |
0 : 0 a.e.t. |
Schema Compare |
||
Wednesday, 1977-11-30 00:00 |
0 : 1 |
Schema Compare |