Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Bernd Hoss (from 1978-03-02) (until 1979-11-07) | 1939-06-19 | ||||
Herbert Burdenski (from 1977-11-01) (until 1978-03-01) | 1922-05-19 | ||||
Erhard Ahmann (until 1977-10-31) | 1941-05-21 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Vladimir Kovacic (until 1982-06-30) | 1950-03-06 | ||||
Fritz Stefens (until 1978-06-30) | 1948-10-27 | ||||
Abwehr | |||||
Gerhard Pecl (until 1982-06-30) | 1955-04-17 | ||||
Erich Miss (until 1981-06-30) | 1948-03-16 | ||||
Norbert Heidemann (until 1981-06-30) | 1955-12-10 | ||||
Michael Loesch (until 1981-06-30) | 1956-08-02 | ||||
Lothar Dupke (until 1980-06-30) | 1951-03-28 | ||||
Detlef Spincke (until 1979-06-30) | 1954-02-27 | ||||
Frank Hanisch (until 1978-06-30) | 1953-11-06 | ||||
Jurgen-Michael Galbierz (until 1977-12-31) | 1950-02-07 | ||||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Antoine Fagot (from 1977-12-01) (until 1980-06-30) | 1956-07-24 | ||||
Rainer Budde (until 1979-06-30) | 1948-05-01 | ||||
Jurgen Berghaus (until 1979-06-30) | 1953-10-08 | ||||
Achim Pauli (until 1979-06-30) | 1956-02-17 | ||||
Bernhard Hermes (until 1978-09-15) | 1945-09-08 | ||||
Georg Jung (until 1978-06-30) | 1946-08-04 | ||||
Peter Maulshagen (until 1978-06-30) | 1953-04-30 | ||||
Ulrich Scherber (until 1978-06-30) | 1957-09-01 | ||||
Sturm | |||||
Peter Redder (until 1981-06-30) | 1952-09-25 | ||||
Gunter Propper (until 1979-06-30) | 1941-12-08 | ||||
Peter Hayduk (from 1977-08-19) (until 1979-06-30) | 1953-04-10 | ||||
Lothar Angermund (until 1978-06-30) | 1952-11-11 | ||||
Klaus Thies (until 1978-06-30) | 1950-10-25 | ||||
Helmut Lausen (until 1978-06-30) | 1952-06-09 | ||||
Willi Gotz (until 1977-11-06) | 1947-09-20 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Saturday, 1977-07-30 00:00 |
2 : 2 a.e.t. |
Schema Compare |
||
Wednesday, 1977-08-10 00:00 |
3 : 0 |
Schema Compare |