Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Friedel Elting (until 1982-06-30) | 1936-12-12 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Wolfgang Kieselmann (until 1982-06-30) | 1955-11-15 | ||||
Gunther Schubert (until 1980-06-30) | 1955-01-11 | ||||
Abwehr | |||||
Lothar Schulz (until 1984-06-30) | 1957-01-04 | ||||
Lutz Philipp (until 1983-06-30) | 1949-05-22 | ||||
Wolfgang Keuken (until 1982-06-30) | 1954-11-05 | ||||
Manfred Bockenfeld (until 1981-06-30) | 1960-07-23 | ||||
Jan Roeloffzen (until 1981-06-30) | 1950-01-20 | ||||
Edmund Stieber (until 1979-06-30) | 1948-01-03 | ||||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Uwe Montelett (until 1983-06-30) | 1956-07-24 | ||||
Uwe Hansel (until 1983-06-30) | 1956-09-29 | ||||
Wolfgang Franke (until 1981-06-30) | 1954-05-24 | ||||
Georg Schmeinck (until 1980-06-30) | 1955-11-12 | ||||
Wilfried Krause (until 1979-12-31) | 1948-09-03 | ||||
Sturm | |||||
Werner Albrecht (until 1983-06-30) | 1953-03-30 | ||||
Peter Muller (until 1982-06-30) | 1948-10-11 | ||||
Jurgen Tanzer (until 1981-06-30) | 1951-04-26 | ||||
Werner Weikamp (until 1980-06-30) | 1941-09-20 | ||||
Uwe Steigerwald (until 1980-06-30) | 1956-11-03 | ||||
Jurgen Nabrotzki (until 1979-06-30) | 1954-12-26 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Saturday, 1978-08-05 00:00 |
1 : 8 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 1978-09-23 00:00 |
2 : 2 a.e.t. |
Schema Compare |
||
Wednesday, 1978-10-04 00:00 |
3 : 2 a.e.t. |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 1978-12-02 00:00 |
3 : 1 a.e.t. |
Schema Compare |