Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Slobodan Cendic (from 1978-11-17) (until 1980-10-24) | 1938-08-28 | ||||
Hans Cieslarczyk (until 1978-11-15) | 1937-05-03 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Dieter Ferner (until 1980-06-30) | 1949-01-16 | ||||
Norbert Sauer (until 1979-06-30) | 1949-12-16 | ||||
Abwehr | |||||
Walter Muller (until 1987-06-30) | 1954-03-28 | ||||
Ernst Traser (until 1985-06-30) | 1953-01-04 | ||||
Egon Schmitt (until 1982-06-30) | 1948-11-12 | ||||
Horst Bender (until 1979-06-30) | 1954-11-11 | ||||
Reinhold Zech (until 1979-06-30) | 1948-05-27 | ||||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Aron Schopfer (until 1983-06-30) | 1960-12-12 | ||||
Norbert Schmidt (until 1982-06-30) | 1960-11-23 | ||||
Ludwig Denz (until 1981-06-30) | 1949-01-01 | ||||
Heinz Traser (until 1981-06-30) | 1953-01-04 | ||||
Gerd Muller (until 1980-06-30) | 1954-03-28 | ||||
Frank Niederlander (until 1980-06-30) | 1960-03-25 | ||||
Alexander Schwarz (until 1979-09-02) | 1954-10-26 | ||||
Sturm | |||||
Werner Heck (until 1980-06-30) | 1955-04-21 | ||||
Gunther Michl (until 1980-06-30) | 1950-05-30 | ||||
Rainer Kunkel (until 1980-06-30) | 1950-04-09 | ||||
Konrad Eickels (until 1980-06-30) | 1956-06-11 | ||||
Erich Unger (until 1980-06-30) | 1951-08-26 | ||||
Peter Schmidt (until 1979-06-30) | 1951-04-24 | ||||
Peter Frenzle (until 1979-06-30) | 1959-06-03 | ||||
Rudi Kappes (until 1979-06-30) | 1957-11-29 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Saturday, 1978-08-05 00:00 |
1 : 0 a.e.t. |
Schema Compare |
||
Friday, 1978-09-22 00:00 |
2 : 3 |
Schema Compare |