Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Gunter Luttrop (until 1979-06-30) | 1933-10-28 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Reinhard Biermann (until 1987-06-30) | 1950-11-12 | ||||
Dietmar Wiese (until 1980-06-30) | 1956-05-03 | ||||
Abwehr | |||||
Peter Wieczorek (until 1987-06-30) | 1953-02-23 | ||||
Norbert Hohmann (until 1982-06-30) | 1952-05-22 | ||||
Roland Kosien (until 1980-06-30) | 1953-09-25 | ||||
Klaus Wischniewski (until 1980-06-30) | 1954-12-08 | ||||
Henning Keese (until 1980-06-30) | 1955-05-16 | ||||
Heinz Steinhoff (until 1980-06-30) | 1951-03-23 | ||||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Detlef Mikolajczak (until 1987-06-30) | 1964-04-15 | ||||
Jurgen Mauthe (until 1982-06-30) | 1950-01-04 | ||||
Ingo Peter (until 1980-06-30) | 1951-10-23 | ||||
Hans-Jurgen Oehler (until 1980-06-30) | 1955-07-15 | ||||
Lothar Franken (until 1979-06-30) | 1958-09-01 | ||||
Sturm | |||||
Norbert Lucke (until 1987-06-30) | 1950-10-22 | ||||
Norbert Rothe (until 1987-06-30) | 1953-09-28 | ||||
Ralf Regenbogen (until 1982-06-30) | 1960-03-24 | ||||
Eckehard Eigenwillig (until 1980-06-30) | 1955-04-14 | ||||
Peter Leske (until 1980-06-30) | 1954-07-22 | ||||
Hans-Jurgen Kuchta (until 1979-06-30) | 1949-03-04 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Saturday, 1978-08-05 00:00 |
2 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Friday, 1978-09-22 00:00 |
4 : 2 a.e.t. |
Schema Compare |