Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Heinz Lucas (from 1979-03-27) (until 1979-10-08) | 1920-08-10 | ||||
Heinz Patzig (from 1979-03-22) (until 1979-03-26) | 1929-09-19 | ||||
Werner Olk (until 1979-03-21) | 1938-01-18 | ||||
Co-Trainer | |||||
Heinz Patzig (from 1979-03-27) (until 1983-04-22) | 1929-09-19 | ||||
Heinz Patzig (until 1979-03-21) | 1929-09-19 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Bernd Franke (until 1985-06-30) | 1948-02-12 | ||||
Uwe Hain (until 1982-06-30) | 1955-10-18 | ||||
Abwehr | |||||
Franz Merkhoffer (until 1984-06-30) | 1946-11-29 | ||||
Reiner Hollmann (until 1984-06-30) | 1949-09-30 | ||||
Hasse Borg (until 1983-06-30) | 1953-08-04 | ||||
Wolfgang Grobe (until 1982-06-30) | 1956-06-25 | ||||
Dieter Zembski (until 1980-06-30) | 1946-11-06 | ||||
Friedhelm Haebermann (until 1979-06-30) | 1946-07-24 | ||||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Matthias Bruns (until 1986-06-30) | 1957-08-19 | ||||
Manfred Tripbacher (from 1979-01-01) (until 1986-06-30) | 1957-02-23 | ||||
Dietmar Erler (until 1981-06-30) | 1947-04-07 | ||||
Danilo Popivoda (until 1981-06-30) | 1947-05-01 | ||||
Karl-Heinz Handschuh (until 1980-06-30) | 1947-11-30 | ||||
Uwe Krause (until 1980-06-30) | 1955-10-13 | ||||
Wolfgang Dremmler (until 1979-06-30) | 1954-07-12 | ||||
Harald Aumeier (until 1979-06-30) | 1952-07-19 | ||||
Sturm | |||||
Peter Lubeke (until 1980-06-30) | 1952-11-26 | ||||
Frank Holzer (until 1980-06-30) | 1953-03-05 | ||||
Harald Nickel (until 1979-06-30) | 1953-07-21 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Saturday, 1978-08-05 00:00 |
2 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 1978-09-23 00:00 |
1 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Friday, 1978-12-01 00:00 |
3 : 2 a.e.t. |
Schema Compare |