Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Uwe Klimaschefski (until 1980-06-30) | 1938-12-11 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Gunnar Fellmann (until 1982-06-30) | 1959-04-08 | ||||
Gregor Quasten (until 1980-06-30) | 1952-10-03 | ||||
Abwehr | |||||
Jesper Petersen (until 1986-06-30) | 1951-04-02 | ||||
Kurt Knoll (until 1981-08-31) | 1958-07-16 | ||||
Walter Gruler (until 1980-06-30) | 1951-08-24 | ||||
Horst Ehrmantraut (until 1979-06-30) | 1955-12-11 | ||||
Volker Faul (until 1979-06-30) | 1952-10-30 | ||||
Albert Muller (until 1979-06-30) | 1947-05-06 | ||||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Bernd Beck (until 1981-06-30) | 1956-07-18 | ||||
Giovanni Nicastro (until 1981-06-30) | 1953-01-07 | ||||
Ernst Hodel (until 1980-06-30) | 1950-03-15 | ||||
Herbert Ney (until 1980-06-30) | 1955-09-07 | ||||
Gerd Schwickert (until 1979-06-30) | 1949-08-14 | ||||
Harald Diener (until 1979-06-30) | 1948-02-18 | ||||
Jurgen Krawczyk (until 1978-09-03) | 1953-01-01 | ||||
Sturm | |||||
Manfred Lenz (until 1986-06-30) | 1947-11-21 | ||||
Karlheinz Subklewe (until 1981-06-30) | 1950-12-06 | ||||
Wilfried Klinge (until 1980-09-30) | 1950-08-15 | ||||
Bernd Detterer (until 1980-06-30) | 1948-12-24 | ||||
Gerd Warken (until 1980-06-30) | 1951-03-05 | ||||
Frank-Michael Schonert (until 1979-06-30) | 1951-08-30 | ||||
Harry Erhart (until 1979-06-30) | 1953-07-03 | ||||
Alfred Riess (from 1978-11-19) (until 1979-06-30) | 1952-10-29 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Saturday, 1978-08-05 00:00 |
0 : 3 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 1978-09-24 00:00 |
4 : 2 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 1978-12-02 00:00 |
0 : 0 a.e.t. |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 1979-01-07 00:00 |
1 : 0 |
Schema Compare |