Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Hans Cieslarczyk (from 1979-01-01) (until 1979-06-30) | 1937-05-03 | ||||
Werner Sterzik (until 1978-12-31) | 1940-01-09 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Albert Zettler (until 1982-06-30) | 1957-10-06 | ||||
Hermann Lutz (until 1981-06-30) | 1951-11-03 | ||||
Abwehr | |||||
Ewald Schaffner (until 1979-06-30) | 1948-11-17 | ||||
Rainer Dorr (until 1979-06-30) | 1955-06-04 | ||||
Herbert Stahl (until 1979-06-30) | 1954-09-28 | ||||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Gerhard Forschner (until 1985-06-30) | 1955-11-26 | ||||
Reinhard Kindermann (until 1980-06-30) | 1960-03-10 | ||||
Armin Veh (until 1979-06-30) | 1961-02-01 | ||||
Willi Bernecker (until 1979-06-30) | 1956-03-09 | ||||
Helmut Haller (until 1979-06-30) | 1939-07-21 | ||||
Kurt Kalchschmid (until 1979-06-30) | 1958-03-22 | ||||
Erich Steer (until 1979-06-30) | 1956-11-28 | ||||
Manfred Tripbacher (until 1978-12-31) | 1957-02-23 | ||||
Sturm | |||||
Hans Jorg (until 1981-06-30) | 1950-11-04 | ||||
Arnulf Klein (until 1981-06-30) | 1957-06-03 | ||||
Hans-Joachim Schnurer (until 1980-06-30) | 1960-02-22 | ||||
Georg Beichle (until 1979-06-30) | 1948-09-16 | ||||
Harald Greifenegger (until 1979-06-30) | 1959-11-18 | ||||
Karl-Heinz Stempfle (until 1979-06-30) | 1956-02-22 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Saturday, 1978-08-05 00:00 |
4 : 2 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 1978-09-23 00:00 |
1 : 3 |
Schema Compare |