Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Milovan Beljin (from 1979-04-06) (until 1979-06-30) | 1936-09-07 | ||||
Norbert Wagner (until 1979-04-05) | 1939-01-15 | ||||
Co-Trainer | |||||
Hans Linsenmaier (until 1979-06-30) | 1941-04-28 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Wolfgang Dotzauer (until 1984-06-30) | 1960-09-17 | ||||
Karl Armbrust (until 1982-06-30) | 1946-08-21 | ||||
Yves Bischoff (until 1981-06-30) | 1958-04-29 | ||||
Hubert Birkenmeier (until 1979-06-30) | 1949-05-24 | ||||
Abwehr | |||||
Thomas Schneider (until 1984-06-30) | 1959-10-29 | ||||
Heinrich Schnitzer (until 1981-06-30) | 1949-09-01 | ||||
Uli Bruder (until 1980-06-30) | 1953-01-30 | ||||
Dieter Hug (until 1980-06-30) | 1953-12-13 | ||||
Peter Karvouniaris (until 1980-06-30) | 1955-04-11 | ||||
Dieter Steinwarz (until 1980-06-30) | 1948-09-02 | ||||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Heinz-Dieter Derigs (until 1985-06-30) | 1953-10-19 | ||||
Andreas Braun (until 1983-06-30) | 1960-10-17 | ||||
Karl-Heinz Schulz (until 1982-06-30) | 1955-12-21 | ||||
Buffy Ettmayer (until 1981-06-30) | 1946-07-23 | ||||
Karl-Heinz Miessmer (until 1981-06-30) | 1947-03-14 | ||||
Bernd Vogtmann (until 1981-06-30) | 1949-04-08 | ||||
Alfred Metzler (until 1980-06-30) | 1951-04-29 | ||||
Bernd Stobeck (until 1980-06-30) | 1951-03-27 | ||||
Karl-Heinz Bente (until 1979-06-30) | 1941-09-13 | ||||
Ulli Loffler (until 1979-06-30) | 1958-07-21 | ||||
Sturm | |||||
Jurgen Marek (until 1981-06-30) | 1951-08-24 | ||||
Hans-Peter Widmann (until 1980-06-30) | 1955-05-01 | ||||
Karl-Heinz Buhrer (until 1979-06-30) | 1959-10-20 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Friday, 1978-08-04 00:00 |
6 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 1978-09-23 00:00 |
2 : 2 a.e.t. |
Schema Compare |
||
Wednesday, 1978-10-04 00:00 |
3 : 2 a.e.t. |
Schema Compare |