Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Kuno Klotzer (until 1979-10-27) | 1922-04-19 | ||||
Co-Trainer | |||||
Hans Eder (until 1979-10-27) | 1934-11-14 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Manfred Werner (until 1984-06-30) | 1951-02-02 | ||||
Norbert Nigbur (until 1979-06-30) | 1948-05-08 | ||||
Abwehr | |||||
Holger Bruck (until 1981-06-30) | 1947-09-30 | ||||
Jurgen Diefenbach (until 1981-06-30) | 1956-03-27 | ||||
Uwe Kliemann (until 1980-06-30) | 1949-06-30 | ||||
Michael Sziedat (until 1980-06-30) | 1952-08-22 | ||||
Hans-Joachim Forster (until 1980-06-30) | 1955-08-01 | ||||
Hans Weiner (until 1979-06-30) | 1950-11-29 | ||||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Wolfgang Sidka (until 1980-06-30) | 1954-05-26 | ||||
Dieter Nussing (until 1980-06-30) | 1949-08-15 | ||||
Rainer Blechschmidt (until 1980-06-30) | 1953-12-20 | ||||
Ole Rasmussen (until 1980-06-30) | 1952-03-19 | ||||
Erich Beer (until 1979-06-30) | 1946-12-09 | ||||
Bernd Gersdorff (until 1979-03-31) | 1946-11-18 | ||||
Sturm | |||||
Thomas Remark (until 1983-11-30) | 1959-10-05 | ||||
Dietmar Kramer (until 1980-06-30) | 1955-09-11 | ||||
Michael Toppel (until 1980-06-30) | 1957-08-08 | ||||
Henrik Agerbeck (until 1980-06-30) | 1956-09-10 | ||||
Jurgen Milewski (until 1979-12-01) | 1957-10-19 | ||||
Karl-Heinz Granitza (until 1978-12-31) | 1951-11-01 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Saturday, 1978-08-05 00:00 |
0 : 2 a.e.t. |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 1978-09-23 00:00 |
1 : 1 a.e.t. |
Schema Compare |
||
Tuesday, 1978-11-07 00:00 |
2 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 1978-12-02 00:00 |
2 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 1979-04-28 00:00 |
2 : 0 a.e.t. |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 1979-05-26 00:00 |
6 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Wednesday, 1979-06-06 00:00 |
2 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 1979-06-23 16:00 |
0 : 1 a.e.t. |
Schema Compare |