Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Norbert Wagner (from 1979-04-18) (until 1979-06-30) | 1939-01-15 | ||||
Bernd Oles (until 1979-04-15) | 1921-01-15 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Peter Schuler (until 1980-06-30) | 1953-07-16 | ||||
Harald Klapper (until 1979-06-30) | 1948-07-08 | ||||
Lothar Uhl (until 1979-06-30) | 1946-08-15 | ||||
Abwehr | |||||
Horst Prantschke (until 1988-06-30) | 1953-06-24 | ||||
Edmond Melzer (until 1984-06-30) | 1957-08-20 | ||||
Hans-Dieter Diehl (until 1980-06-30) | 1951-03-30 | ||||
Karl-Heinz Dickkopf (until 1980-06-30) | 1952-02-07 | ||||
Uwe Erkenbrecher (until 1979-06-30) | 1954-11-14 | ||||
Otto Kastl (until 1979-06-30) | 1947-08-21 | ||||
Hans-Adolf Schade (until 1979-06-30) | 1944-06-30 | ||||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Gerhard Reinbold (until 1984-06-30) | 1955-04-12 | ||||
Wayne Thomas (until 1980-06-30) | 1958-09-02 | ||||
Klaus Ganz (until 1980-06-30) | 1955-12-01 | ||||
Manfred Grawunder (until 1980-06-30) | 1952-03-16 | ||||
Jurgen Krawczyk (from 1978-09-04) (until 1980-06-30) | 1953-01-01 | ||||
Wolfgang Reichel (until 1979-12-31) | 1958-02-18 | ||||
Otmar Riedl (until 1979-06-30) | 1958-09-03 | ||||
Sturm | |||||
Bernd Krech (until 1980-06-30) | 1957-04-06 | ||||
Wolfgang Sandhowe (until 1979-06-30) | 1953-12-14 | ||||
Rolf Wiesenthal (until 1979-06-30) | 1954-10-04 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Saturday, 1978-08-05 00:00 |
5 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 1978-09-23 00:00 |
3 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 1978-12-02 00:00 |
4 : 1 |
Schema Compare |