Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Hans-Dieter Roos (until 1980-10-20) | 1937-05-22 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Rolf Gerstenlauer (until 1981-06-30) | 1949-06-15 | ||||
Rainer Kuppinger (until 1980-06-30) | 1957-11-26 | ||||
Abwehr | |||||
Rainer Ackermann (until 1985-06-30) | 1957-06-07 | ||||
Dieter Dollmann (until 1983-06-30) | 1947-09-12 | ||||
Hans-Jurgen Voise (until 1982-06-30) | 1954-12-08 | ||||
Dieter Renner (until 1981-06-30) | 1949-12-18 | ||||
Peter Stichler (until 1981-06-30) | 1958-01-15 | ||||
Peter Gromer (until 1979-12-31) | 1955-12-08 | ||||
Joachim Kuhn (until 1979-06-30) | 1955-08-30 | ||||
Horst Schairer (until 1979-06-30) | 1944-05-10 | ||||
Frieder Schomezler (until 1979-06-30) | 1952-02-09 | ||||
Harald Seiffer (until 1979-06-30) | 1955-03-03 | ||||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Eckehard Muller (until 1986-06-30) | 1950-08-12 | ||||
Horst Hayer (from 1978-12-01) (until 1982-06-30) | 1953-09-30 | ||||
Friedrich Goll (until 1980-06-30) | 1955-05-26 | ||||
Jurgen Heselschwerdt (until 1980-06-30) | 1957-04-22 | ||||
Josef Saile (until 1980-06-30) | 1955-05-23 | ||||
Martin Fischer (until 1979-06-30) | 1960-10-03 | ||||
Franz-Josef Toth (until 1979-06-30) | 1955-08-28 | ||||
Reinhold Fischer (until 1979-06-30) | 1955-04-22 | ||||
Sturm | |||||
Uwe Dreher (until 1983-06-30) | 1960-05-13 | ||||
Karl Allgower (until 1980-06-30) | 1957-01-05 | ||||
Bernd Hoffmann (until 1979-06-30) | 1946-07-09 | ||||
Horst Haug (until 1979-06-30) | 1946-05-12 | ||||
Joachim Kehl (until 1979-06-30) | 1958-07-09 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Saturday, 1978-08-05 00:00 |
7 : 2 |
Schema Compare |