Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Fritz Schollmeyer (until 1982-06-30) | 1922-06-19 | ||||
Reinhard Roder (until 1980-02-06) | 1941-07-06 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Peter Endrulat (until 1981-06-30) | 1954-08-10 | ||||
Gerhard Welz (until 1979-06-30) | 1945-02-01 | ||||
Abwehr | |||||
Frank-Michael Marczewski (until 1983-06-30) | 1954-04-30 | ||||
Frank Hanisch (until 1982-06-30) | 1953-11-06 | ||||
Manfred Kruger (until 1982-06-30) | 1952-08-11 | ||||
Jochem Ziegert (until 1980-12-20) | 1954-07-25 | ||||
Klaus-Peter Hanisch (until 1980-06-30) | 1952-01-29 | ||||
Hans-Jurgen Baake (until 1979-12-31) | 1954-03-02 | ||||
Reinhard Schmitz (until 1979-06-30) | 1951-06-09 | ||||
Hans Sprenger (until 1979-06-30) | 1948-10-12 | ||||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Jurgen Schulz (until 1982-06-30) | 1952-10-06 | ||||
Alfred Arbinger (until 1980-06-30) | 1957-06-06 | ||||
Norbert Schmitz (until 1980-06-30) | 1958-12-27 | ||||
Dieter Hochheimer (until 1979-12-31) | 1952-09-24 | ||||
Allan Hansen (until 1979-12-31) | 1956-04-21 | ||||
Sturm | |||||
Norbert Stolzenburg (until 1982-06-30) | 1952-05-12 | ||||
Wolfgang Schilling (until 1982-06-30) | 1955-06-09 | ||||
Peter Vogel (until 1981-06-30) | 1952-08-24 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Saturday, 1978-08-05 00:00 |
2 : 0 a.e.t. |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 1978-09-23 00:00 |
3 : 3 a.e.t. |
Schema Compare |
||
Wednesday, 1978-10-04 00:00 |
3 : 4 PSO |
Schema Compare |
||
Wednesday, 1978-11-29 00:00 |
0 : 2 |
Schema Compare |