Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Eckhard Krautzun (from 1978-12-26) (until 1979-09-20) | 1941-01-13 | ||||
Heinz Lucas (until 1978-12-23) | 1920-08-10 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Thomas Zander (from 1979-01-01) (until 1987-06-30) | 1951-08-10 | ||||
Bernhard Hartmann (until 1979-06-30) | 1947-05-25 | ||||
Abwehr | |||||
Herbert Scheller (until 1981-06-30) | 1948-05-19 | ||||
Rudolf Sturz (until 1981-06-30) | 1952-11-18 | ||||
Hans Fischl (until 1980-06-30) | 1953-07-19 | ||||
Alfred Kohlhaufl (until 1979-06-30) | 1946-10-10 | ||||
Dieter Agatha (until 1979-06-30) | 1956-12-14 | ||||
Willi Bierofka (until 1979-06-30) | 1953-01-21 | ||||
Ahmet Glavovic (until 1979-06-30) | 1948-07-13 | ||||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Alfred Herberth (until 1981-06-30) | 1955-12-26 | ||||
Josef Stering (until 1980-06-30) | 1949-03-06 | ||||
Niels Poulsen (from 1979-01-01) (until 1979-09-30) | 1955-10-03 | ||||
Hans Haunstein (until 1979-06-30) | 1950-08-07 | ||||
Jan-Hoiland Nielsen (until 1979-06-30) | 1952-01-15 | ||||
Klaus Vohringer (until 1979-06-30) | 1951-06-01 | ||||
Sturm | |||||
Wolfgang Metzler (until 1980-10-31) | 1952-06-23 | ||||
Erhard Hofeditz (until 1980-06-30) | 1953-12-07 | ||||
Franz Gerber (until 1980-06-30) | 1953-11-27 | ||||
Georg Metzger (until 1980-06-30) | 1946-11-13 | ||||
Anton Nachreiner (until 1980-06-30) | 1955-09-10 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Saturday, 1978-08-05 00:00 |
0 : 5 |
Schema Compare |