Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Jurgen Sundermann (until 1979-06-30) | 1940-01-25 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Helmut Roleder (until 1987-06-30) | 1953-10-09 | ||||
Klaus Funk (until 1979-06-30) | 1954-02-21 | ||||
Abwehr | |||||
Bernd Forster (until 1986-06-30) | 1956-05-03 | ||||
Karlheinz Forster (until 1986-06-30) | 1958-07-25 | ||||
Bernd Martin (until 1982-06-30) | 1955-02-10 | ||||
Dragan Holcer (until 1981-06-30) | 1945-01-19 | ||||
Arno Schafer (until 1980-06-30) | 1954-08-31 | ||||
Rainer Ruhle (until 1980-06-30) | 1956-06-10 | ||||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Hermann Ohlicher (until 1985-06-30) | 1949-11-02 | ||||
Erwin Hadewicz (until 1983-06-30) | 1951-04-02 | ||||
Hansi Muller (until 1982-06-30) | 1957-07-27 | ||||
Roland Hattenberger (until 1981-06-30) | 1948-12-07 | ||||
Markus Elmer (until 1980-06-30) | 1952-12-21 | ||||
Helmut Dietterle (until 1980-06-30) | 1951-06-02 | ||||
Bernd Schmider (until 1978-09-30) | 1955-05-03 | ||||
Sturm | |||||
Walter Kelsch (until 1984-06-30) | 1955-09-03 | ||||
Harald Beck (until 1982-06-30) | 1957-07-29 | ||||
Bernd Klotz (until 1981-06-30) | 1958-09-08 | ||||
Georg Volkert (until 1980-06-30) | 1945-11-28 | ||||
Klaus-Dieter Jank (until 1980-06-30) | 1952-11-23 | ||||
Dieter Hoeness (until 1979-06-30) | 1953-01-07 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Friday, 1978-08-04 00:00 |
12 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 1978-09-23 00:00 |
3 : 2 |
Schema Compare |