Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Heinz Hoher (until 1979-06-30) | 1938-08-11 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Reinhard Mager (until 1984-06-30) | 1953-05-02 | ||||
Werner Scholz (until 1981-06-30) | 1944-12-01 | ||||
Abwehr | |||||
Lothar Woelk (until 1989-06-30) | 1954-08-03 | ||||
Hermann Gerland (until 1984-06-30) | 1954-06-04 | ||||
Michael Eggert (until 1980-06-30) | 1952-09-29 | ||||
Klaus Franke (until 1980-06-30) | 1948-05-23 | ||||
Dieter Versen (until 1979-06-30) | 1945-06-22 | ||||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Ata Lameck (until 1988-06-30) | 1949-09-15 | ||||
Walter Oswald (until 1986-06-30) | 1955-10-08 | ||||
Rolf Blau (until 1982-06-30) | 1952-05-21 | ||||
Franz-Josef Tenhagen (until 1981-06-30) | 1952-10-31 | ||||
Hans-Jurgen Koper (until 1980-06-30) | 1951-08-29 | ||||
Werner Schachten (until 1980-06-30) | 1954-09-16 | ||||
Paul Holz (until 1979-06-30) | 1952-09-27 | ||||
Dieter Bast (until 1979-06-30) | 1951-08-28 | ||||
Holger Trimhold (until 1979-06-30) | 1953-06-13 | ||||
Sturm | |||||
Hans-Joachim Abel (until 1982-06-30) | 1952-06-25 | ||||
Jupp Kaczor (until 1980-12-31) | 1953-03-23 | ||||
Heinz-Werner Eggeling (until 1979-11-30) | 1955-04-17 | ||||
Hans-Joachim Pochstein (until 1979-06-30) | 1952-10-30 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Saturday, 1978-08-05 00:00 |
4 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Friday, 1978-09-22 00:00 |
4 : 2 a.e.t. |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 1978-12-02 00:00 |
0 : 0 a.e.t. |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 1979-01-07 00:00 |
1 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 1979-04-28 00:00 |
4 : 2 |
Schema Compare |