Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Wolfgang Weber (until 1980-01-29) | 1944-06-26 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Dieter Burdenski (until 1988-06-30) | 1950-11-26 | ||||
Albert Voss (until 1981-06-30) | 1951-09-08 | ||||
Abwehr | |||||
Thomas Schaaf (until 1995-06-30) | 1961-04-30 | ||||
Karl-Heinz Kamp (until 1985-06-30) | 1946-09-26 | ||||
Martin Haskamp (until 1983-06-30) | 1958-09-11 | ||||
Hartmut Konschal (until 1981-10-31) | 1953-04-02 | ||||
Karlheinz Geils (until 1980-06-30) | 1955-05-20 | ||||
Per Rontved (until 1979-06-30) | 1949-01-27 | ||||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Benno Mohlmann (until 1987-10-04) | 1954-08-01 | ||||
Norbert Siegmann (until 1985-06-30) | 1953-05-20 | ||||
Uwe Bracht (until 1984-06-30) | 1953-07-10 | ||||
Franz Hiller (until 1980-06-30) | 1950-10-22 | ||||
Jurgen Rober (until 1980-06-30) | 1953-12-25 | ||||
Dimitrios Daras (until 1979-06-30) | 1956-04-21 | ||||
Hans-Jurgen Bargfrede (until 1979-06-30) | 1959-03-10 | ||||
Sturm | |||||
Uwe Reinders (until 1985-06-30) | 1955-01-19 | ||||
Paul Linz (until 1980-06-30) | 1956-01-04 | ||||
Werner Dressel (until 1980-06-30) | 1958-08-30 | ||||
Klaus Wunder (until 1980-06-30) | 1950-09-13 | ||||
Wilfried Feldhaus (until 1979-06-30) | 1954-08-23 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Saturday, 1978-08-05 00:00 |
5 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 1978-09-23 00:00 |
2 : 3 |
Schema Compare |