Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Gerhard Prokop (until 1979-06-30) | 1939-05-18 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Hans-Jurgen Bradler (until 1982-06-30) | 1948-08-12 | ||||
Lothar Matuschak (until 1980-06-30) | 1948-06-10 | ||||
Abwehr | |||||
Franz-Josef Laufer (until 1980-06-30) | 1952-09-01 | ||||
Klaus-Peter Kudella (until 1980-06-30) | 1949-03-07 | ||||
Werner Lappeneit (until 1980-06-30) | 1953-09-20 | ||||
Hartmut Fromm (until 1979-06-30) | 1950-10-15 | ||||
Bernhard Ochmann (until 1979-06-30) | 1952-01-09 | ||||
Gunter Kuczinski (until 1979-06-30) | 1954-09-07 | ||||
Soren Busk (until 1979-06-30) | 1953-04-10 | ||||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Helmut Gorka (until 1980-06-30) | 1960-04-13 | ||||
Ralf Kortwinkel (until 1980-06-30) | 1959-03-06 | ||||
Hans-Gunter Etterich (until 1979-06-30) | 1951-08-16 | ||||
Bernd Brexendorf (until 1979-06-30) | 1954-10-21 | ||||
Klaus Scheer (until 1979-06-30) | 1950-10-04 | ||||
Klaus Beverungen (from 1978-12-08) (until 1979-06-30) | 1951-09-24 | ||||
Klaus Santanius (until 1979-06-30) | 1958-08-21 | ||||
Lutz Gerresheim (until 1979-06-30) | 1958-09-19 | ||||
Herbert Bals (until 1979-06-30) | 1949-03-14 | ||||
Reinhard Klose (until 1979-06-30) | 1957-08-24 | ||||
Hartmut Sinnigen (until 1979-06-30) | 1952-08-15 | ||||
Sturm | |||||
Hans Fos (until 1980-06-30) | 1959-11-07 | ||||
Hans Fritsche (until 1979-06-30) | 1950-03-03 | ||||
Rainer Fischer (until 1979-06-30) | 1953-08-28 | ||||
Heinz-Dieter Greif (until 1979-06-30) | 1949-08-15 | ||||
Klaus Wolf (until 1979-06-30) | 1948-07-03 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Sunday, 1978-08-06 00:00 |
0 : 4 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 1978-09-24 00:00 |
2 : 3 |
Schema Compare |