Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Bernd Hoss (until 1979-11-07) | 1939-06-19 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Vladimir Kovacic (until 1982-06-30) | 1950-03-06 | ||||
Dieter Schlosser (until 1980-06-30) | 1955-02-04 | ||||
Ulrich Gelhard (until 1980-06-30) | 1946-05-26 | ||||
Abwehr | |||||
Gerhard Pecl (until 1982-06-30) | 1955-04-17 | ||||
Erich Miss (until 1981-06-30) | 1948-03-16 | ||||
Norbert Heidemann (until 1981-06-30) | 1955-12-10 | ||||
Michael Loesch (until 1981-06-30) | 1956-08-02 | ||||
Lothar Dupke (until 1980-06-30) | 1951-03-28 | ||||
Wolfgang Koch (until 1980-06-30) | 1955-12-22 | ||||
Jurgen-Michael Galbierz (until 1979-06-30) | 1950-02-07 | ||||
Detlef Spincke (until 1979-06-30) | 1954-02-27 | ||||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Antoine Fagot (until 1980-06-30) | 1956-07-24 | ||||
Karl-Heinz Zorr (until 1980-06-30) | 1956-09-11 | ||||
Rainer Budde (until 1979-06-30) | 1948-05-01 | ||||
Jurgen Berghaus (until 1979-06-30) | 1953-10-08 | ||||
Achim Pauli (until 1979-06-30) | 1956-02-17 | ||||
Bernhard Hermes (until 1978-09-15) | 1945-09-08 | ||||
Sturm | |||||
Peter Redder (until 1981-06-30) | 1952-09-25 | ||||
Rainer Jakobs (until 1981-06-30) | 1957-02-01 | ||||
Siegbert Maschotta (until 1981-06-30) | 1961-07-07 | ||||
Gunter Propper (until 1979-06-30) | 1941-12-08 | ||||
Peter Hayduk (until 1979-06-30) | 1953-04-10 | ||||
Martin Bernard (until 1979-06-30) | 1960-06-29 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Saturday, 1978-08-05 00:00 |
4 : 2 |
Schema Compare |