Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Robert Gebhardt (from 1979-08-21) (until 1980-06-30) | 1920-09-20 | ||||
Jef Vliers (from 1979-07-31) (until 1979-08-20) | 1932-12-18 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Bernhard Hartmann (until 1983-06-30) | 1947-05-25 | ||||
Herbert Heider (until 1980-06-30) | 1959-09-21 | ||||
Abwehr | |||||
Horst Weyerich (until 1985-06-30) | 1957-08-13 | ||||
Norbert Eder (until 1984-06-30) | 1955-11-07 | ||||
Alois Reinhardt (until 1984-06-30) | 1961-11-18 | ||||
Peter Stocker (until 1983-06-30) | 1953-06-30 | ||||
Norbert Schlegel (until 1983-06-30) | 1961-03-09 | ||||
Gunter Eymold (until 1982-06-30) | 1959-04-17 | ||||
Bertram Beierlorzer (until 1981-06-30) | 1957-05-31 | ||||
Jurgen Tauber (until 1980-12-31) | 1955-04-12 | ||||
Hans Pausch (until 1979-10-31) | 1957-09-09 | ||||
Gunter Dampfling (until 1979-08-31) | 1956-01-11 | ||||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Dieter Lieberwirth (until 1988-12-31) | 1954-01-13 | ||||
Reinhold Hintermaier (until 1984-06-30) | 1956-02-14 | ||||
Reinhold Scholl (until 1982-06-30) | 1955-10-23 | ||||
Jan Majkowski (until 1981-06-30) | 1952-10-20 | ||||
Franz Heitzer (until 1980-06-30) | 1962-01-19 | ||||
Peter Fuchs (until 1979-11-30) | 1955-03-09 | ||||
Sturm | |||||
Herbert Heidenreich (until 1982-06-30) | 1954-11-15 | ||||
Franz Oberacher (until 1981-06-30) | 1954-03-24 | ||||
Detlev Szymanek (until 1980-10-31) | 1954-04-16 | ||||
Klaus Tauber (until 1980-08-21) | 1958-01-17 | ||||
Alfred Steinkirchner (until 1980-06-30) | 1956-10-23 | ||||
Siegfried Susser (until 1980-06-30) | 1953-07-12 | ||||
Hans-Otto Jordan (until 1979-08-31) | 1954-09-13 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Saturday, 1979-08-25 00:00 |
3 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Friday, 1979-09-28 00:00 |
5 : 2 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 1980-01-12 00:00 |
1 : 2 |
Schema Compare |