Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Hans-Dieter Tippenhauer (from 1979-10-15) (until 1980-10-20) | 1943-10-16 | ||||
Otto Rehhagel (until 1979-10-11) | 1938-08-09 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Friedel Schuller (until 1981-06-30) | 1953-11-01 | ||||
Uli Stein (until 1980-06-30) | 1954-10-23 | ||||
Abwehr | |||||
Detlef Schnier (until 1985-06-30) | 1956-08-05 | ||||
Heiko Meier (until 1983-12-08) | 1961-01-06 | ||||
Eduard Angele (until 1982-06-30) | 1951-12-10 | ||||
Hans-Werner Moors (until 1980-06-30) | 1950-07-24 | ||||
Wolfgang Berg (until 1980-06-30) | 1951-05-10 | ||||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Helmut Schroder (until 1988-06-30) | 1958-03-01 | ||||
Ulrich Buscher (until 1987-06-30) | 1958-10-20 | ||||
Wolfgang Pohl (until 1985-06-30) | 1954-12-30 | ||||
Frank Pagelsdorf (until 1984-06-30) | 1958-02-05 | ||||
Peter Krobbach (until 1982-08-31) | 1954-01-15 | ||||
Norbert Eilenfeldt (until 1981-06-30) | 1956-02-17 | ||||
Lorenz-Gunther Kostner (until 1981-06-30) | 1952-01-30 | ||||
Roland Peitsch (until 1981-06-30) | 1949-09-01 | ||||
Roland Weidle (until 1980-06-30) | 1949-01-01 | ||||
Sturm | |||||
Gerd-Volker Schock (until 1982-06-30) | 1950-04-08 | ||||
Christian Sackewitz (until 1981-06-30) | 1955-12-11 | ||||
Volker Graul (until 1981-06-30) | 1952-06-18 | ||||
Stefan Kuhlhorn (until 1981-06-30) | 1961-12-07 | ||||
Billy Ohlsson (until 1979-12-31) | 1954-01-13 | ||||
Harry Ellbracht (until 1979-11-30) | 1953-09-13 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Saturday, 1979-08-25 00:00 |
1 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 1979-09-30 00:00 |
1 : 8 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 1980-01-12 00:00 |
3 : 1 a.e.t. |
Schema Compare |