Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Jupp Heynckes (until 1987-06-30) | 1945-05-09 | ||||
Co-Trainer | |||||
Wolf Werner (until 1987-06-30) | 1942-04-08 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Ulrich Sude (until 1986-12-31) | 1956-04-19 | ||||
Wolfgang Kneib (until 1980-06-30) | 1952-11-20 | ||||
Abwehr | |||||
Wilfried Hannes (until 1986-06-30) | 1957-05-17 | ||||
Norbert Ringels (until 1985-06-30) | 1956-09-16 | ||||
Frank Schaffer (until 1983-06-30) | 1952-07-06 | ||||
Hans Klinkhammer (until 1980-06-30) | 1953-08-23 | ||||
Helmut Dudek (until 1980-06-30) | 1957-12-14 | ||||
Hans-Gunter Bruns (until 1979-08-31) | 1954-11-15 | ||||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Winfried Schafer (until 1985-06-30) | 1950-01-10 | ||||
Lothar Matthaus (until 1984-06-30) | 1961-03-21 | ||||
Jurgen Fleer (until 1984-06-30) | 1957-02-26 | ||||
Armin Veh (until 1983-06-30) | 1961-02-01 | ||||
Ralf Bodeker (until 1982-06-30) | 1958-05-12 | ||||
Christian Kulik (until 1981-06-30) | 1952-12-06 | ||||
Carsten Nielsen (until 1981-06-30) | 1955-08-12 | ||||
Dietmar Danner (until 1980-06-30) | 1950-11-29 | ||||
Willi Junker (until 1980-06-30) | 1960-01-06 | ||||
Horst Wohlers (until 1979-11-30) | 1949-08-06 | ||||
Sturm | |||||
Harald Nickel (until 1981-06-30) | 1953-07-21 | ||||
Ewald Lienen (until 1981-06-30) | 1953-11-28 | ||||
Steen Thychosen (until 1981-06-30) | 1958-09-22 | ||||
Ulrich Wielandt (until 1980-09-30) | 1956-04-22 | ||||
Kalle Del'Haye (until 1980-06-30) | 1955-08-18 | ||||
Helmut Lausen (until 1980-06-30) | 1952-06-09 | ||||
Rudi Gores (until 1980-06-30) | 1957-09-05 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Saturday, 1979-08-25 00:00 |
2 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Friday, 1979-09-28 00:00 |
4 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 1980-01-12 00:00 |
1 : 0 a.e.t. |
Schema Compare |