Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Fahrudin Jusufi (from 1980-04-21) (until 1981-05-26) | 1939-12-08 | ||||
Dietmar Schwager (from 1979-12-05) (until 1980-04-20) | 1940-08-15 | ||||
Gyula Lorant (until 1979-12-04) | 1923-02-06 | ||||
Co-Trainer | |||||
Fahrudin Jusufi (until 1980-04-20) | 1939-12-08 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Norbert Nigbur (until 1983-06-30) | 1948-05-08 | ||||
Peter Sandhofe (until 1983-06-30) | 1957-10-25 | ||||
Abwehr | |||||
Thomas Kruse (until 1988-06-30) | 1959-09-07 | ||||
Winfried Geier (until 1984-06-30) | 1960-08-23 | ||||
Bernd Thiele (until 1983-06-30) | 1956-01-24 | ||||
Vilson Dzoni (until 1981-06-30) | 1950-09-24 | ||||
Rolf Russmann (until 1980-11-30) | 1950-10-13 | ||||
Klaus Fichtel (until 1980-06-30) | 1944-11-19 | ||||
Peter Salisch (until 1979-12-19) | 1961-02-25 | ||||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Michael Opitz (until 1988-06-30) | 1962-07-16 | ||||
Uli Bittcher (until 1983-06-30) | 1957-09-10 | ||||
Harald Kugler (from 1980-01-01) (until 1982-12-31) | 1962-02-15 | ||||
Manfred Drexler (until 1982-06-30) | 1951-06-26 | ||||
Winfried Berkemeier (until 1981-08-30) | 1953-01-22 | ||||
Uwe Hofer (until 1980-10-31) | 1959-07-21 | ||||
Helmut Kremers (until 1980-06-30) | 1949-03-24 | ||||
Mario Boljat (until 1980-06-30) | 1951-08-31 | ||||
Sturm | |||||
Norbert Elgert (until 1982-06-30) | 1957-01-13 | ||||
Klaus Fischer (until 1981-06-30) | 1949-12-27 | ||||
Michael Tonnies (until 1981-06-30) | 1959-12-19 | ||||
Ulrich Schroder (until 1981-06-30) | 1961-08-07 | ||||
Wolfram Wuttke (until 1980-11-30) | 1961-11-17 | ||||
Rudiger Abramczik (until 1980-06-30) | 1956-02-18 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Saturday, 1979-08-25 00:00 |
0 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 1979-09-29 00:00 |
3 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 1980-01-13 00:00 |
3 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Friday, 1980-02-15 00:00 |
2 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 1980-04-05 00:00 |
3 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 1980-05-10 00:00 |
0 : 2 |
Schema Compare |